New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:22-cv-04969
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2022
Re-opened:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Aug 10, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 04, 2023 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE
an individual 10 Teak Lane
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
JOHN PHILIP JOHNSON, JR.
Cozen O'Connor PC
contact info
Notice Only
PHV NEVILLE L. JOHNSON
Notice Only
PHV RODNEY A. SMOLLA
Notice Only
PHV ADAM M. WINOKUR
Notice Only
TAMAR S. WISE
Plaintiff
LIMA JEVREMOVIC
an individual c/o Johnson & Johnson,LLP 439 North Canon Drive Suite 200
Beverly Hills, CA 90210
Represented By
SHERRI A. AFFRUNTI
The Law Office Of Sherri A. Affrunti, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC
Represented By
SHERRI A. AFFRUNTI
The Law Office Of Sherri A. Affrunti, LLC
contact info

GPO Aug 10 2023
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/10/2023. (mlh)
GPO Aug 30 2024
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/30/2024. (jdg, )

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
94 94 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/25 1:25 PM
ORDER Granting93 Motion to Withdraw RODNEY A. SMOLLA as pro hac vice counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/25/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/25 9:48 AM
Set Deadlines as to93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Counsel's Withdrawal of Appearance and Representation re8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ,9 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear . Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
93 93 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/24 5:07 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Counsel's Withdrawal of Appearance and Representation re8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ,9 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC.(OSTROVE, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order