Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-20085

Alabama Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Henry A Callaway
Case #: 2:22-ap-02004
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2022
Terminated:Sep 30, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fashanda Trenise Sams
203 N. Front Street
Demopolis, AL 36732
Represented By
Fashanda Trenise Sams
contact info
Plaintiff
MainStreet Loan Company, Inc.
3050 Highway 5 North, Unit 130
Thomasville, AL 36784
Represented By
William C. Poole
William C. Poole LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Friday, September 30, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/30 4:16 PM
Adversary Case # 2:22-ap-2004 Closed. (LJM)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 17, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 09/17 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/17/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Final Order on Complaint
Thursday, September 15, 2022
8 8 order Final Order on Complaint Thu 09/15 8:54 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT OF NONDISCHARGEABILITY in Adversary Proceeding # 22-2004 Signed on 9/15/2022. Related [+]. Objections to Adversarial Final Order due by 9/29/2022. (EGL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by MainStreet Loan Company, Inc., 7 Stipulation filed by MainStreet Loan Company, Inc., Fashanda Trenise Sams
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
7 7 misc Stipulation Wed 09/14 2:13 PM
Stipulation By MainStreet Loan Company, Inc., Fashanda Trenise Sams and Between MainStreet Loan Company, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff MainStreet Loan Company, Inc., Defendant Fashanda Trenise Sams Related [+]. (Poole, William)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 18, 2022
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 08/18 4:12 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Plaintiff MainStreet Loan Company, Inc.. (Poole, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/12 4:06 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fashanda Trenise Sams . (Blacksher, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 08/09 10:15 AM
Summons Issued on Fashanda Trenise Sams Date Issued 8/9/2022, Answer Due 9/8/2022. (AMB)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice of Scheduling Conference Set Tue 08/09 10:14 AM
Notice of Scheduling Conference Set Related [+]. Scheduling Conference Hearing set for 9/16/2022 at 10:00 AM at Selma Federal Building, Second Floor, 908 Alabama Ave., Selma, AL 36701. (AMB)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by MainStreet Loan Company, Inc.
2 2 utility Notice to Debtor(s) of Incomplete Filing(s) Tue 08/09 10:13 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing(s): Corporate ownership statement required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1) to be filed with the petition has not been filed in this case, or the corporate ownership statement required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 to be filed with the corporate party's first pleading in an adversary proceeding has not been filed in this adversary proceeding. Failure to file the required document(s), by the deadline, will result in a Show Cause hearing. Related [+]. Incomplete Filings due by 8/23/2022. (AMB)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by MainStreet Loan Company, Inc.
Monday, August 08, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/08 3:42 PM
Adversary case 22-02004 Complaint by William C. Poole on behalf of MainStreet Loan Company, Inc. against Fashanda Trenise Sams. Fee Amount $350. (65 (Dischargeability - other)) (Poole, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Live Check Security Agreement Payoff Quote