Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Referred: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Case #: 1:22-cv-01994
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2022
Terminated:May 02, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 30, 2023 2:13 AM MST
Defendant
United States Postal Service
Plaintiff
Marcus Moore
3815 Radiant Drive Apartment 612
Colorado Springs, CO 80917


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/02 12:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re19 Order and20 Final Judgment to Marcus Moore, 3815 Radiant Drive, Apartment 612, Colorado Springs, CO 80917. Text Only Entry (ebuch)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Judgment Tue 05/02 12:13 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant United States Postal Service and against Plaintiff Marcus Moore pursuant to19 Order, by Clerk on 5/2/2023. (ebuch)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Order on Motion for Order Tue 05/02 12:08 PM
ORDER: This case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and failure to comply with the Court's Orders. Denying as moot11 Motion to Reconsider Request Relief,12 Motion to File an Amended Complaint, and18 Motion for Analysis and Decision of Summary Judgment Motion, 28 USC, by Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/2/2023. (ebuch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
18 18 2 pgs motion Order Thu 10/27 3:52 PM
MOTION for Analysis and Decision of Summary Judgment Motion by Plaintiff Marcus Moore.(trvo, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Envelope
Friday, October 21, 2022
16 16 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 10/21 1:19 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to: (1) Identify the specific statutory previsions he relies upon in bringing this action; and (2) Show cause in writing on or before November 3, 2022 , specifically addressing why this Court should not dismiss this case for failure to comply with its prior orders. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to address the Court's instructions in this Order may result in dismissal of this matter. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/21/2022. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 10/21 11:30 AM
DISREGARD - Duplicate Entry. See ECF No. 16 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to: Identify the specific statutory previsions he relies upon in bringing this action; and Show cause in writing on or before November 3, 2022 , specifically addressing why this Court should not dismiss this case for failure to comply with its prior orders. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to address the Court's instructions in this Order may result in dismissal of this matter. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/21/2022. (sdunb, ) Modified on 10/21/2022 to note duplicate entry (trvo, )
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 1:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re16 Order to Show Cause to Marcus Moore at 3815 Radiant Drive Apartment 612 Colorado Springs, CO 80917. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/19 1:23 PM
This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for all motions . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/19/2022. Text Only Entry. (nywlc2, )
Related: [-]
order Memorandum Wed 10/19 1:25 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding12 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify filed by Marcus Moore and11 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Marcus Moore. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/19/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc4,)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Motions No Longer Referred Wed 10/19 4:36 PM
Motion(s) No Longer Referred:11 MOTION for Reconsideration,12 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/19/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc4,)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
12 12 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 09/07 3:54 PM
MOTION to File an Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Marcus Moore.(trvo, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Letter from USPS Inspection Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit - USPS Tracking,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Federal Pro Se Project Application for Legal Services,
Att: 4 Exhibit - USPS Receipt
11 11 motion Reconsideration Wed 09/07 3:50 PM
MOTION to Reconsider for Request Relief by Plaintiff Marcus Moore.(trvo, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Minute Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Experian Account Verification,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Mail from USPS Inspection Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit - Winloot Prize,
Att: 5 Exhibit - Winloot Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit - Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit - USPS Complaint,
Att: 8 Envelope
Monday, August 29, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Mon 08/29 2:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Motion for Complaints [Doc.7 ] is DENIED . The Motion to File an Amended Complaint [Doc.8 ] is DENIED without prejudice . By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/29/2022.(trvo, )
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/29 2:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re9 Minute Order to Marcus Moore at 3815 Radiant Drive Apartment 612 Colorado Springs, CO 80917. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
8 8 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Thu 08/25 10:41 AM
MOTION to File an Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Marcus Moore.(trvo, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/17 3:32 PM
Motion for Complaints by Plaintiff Marcus Moore(trvo, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, August 15, 2022
5 5 5 pgs order Order Mon 08/15 8:57 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint no later than September 15, 2022. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case . Any documents that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include this matter's civil action number. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/15/2022. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/15 8:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re5 Order to Marcus Moore at 3815 Radiant Drive Apt. 612 Colorado Springs, CO 80917. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
4 4 misc Letter Thu 08/11 10:05 AM
LETTER by Plaintiff Marcus Moore.(trvo, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 08/09 3:51 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/09 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against United States Postal Service (Filing Fee: $402, Receipt Number: COX104129), filed by Marcus Moore.(jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Envelope
misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 08/09 3:50 PM
Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]