Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Case #: 2:22-cv-01337
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2022
Terminated:May 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 04, 2023 2:22 AM MST
Defendant
Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated
Represented By
Brittany Jae Reed
Gust Rosenfeld Plc - Phoenix
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Gust Rosenfeld Plc - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Ivol Stever
Represented By
Michael Rhodes Pruitt
Jackson White PC
contact info
Nathaniel James Hill
Jackson White PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, May 19, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/19 2:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/18/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/18 2:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Ivol Stever.(Pruitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/10 2:52 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this case will be dismissed with prejudice on June 9, 2023 unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/10/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions Wed 05/10 1:10 PM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions JOINT by Ivol Stever. (Pruitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/11 4:06 PM
ORDER granting28 Second Motion to Extend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines are modified as follows: Class Certification Motions shall be due by May 23, 2023; Responses to Class Certification Motions shall be due by June 7, 2023; Replies to Class Certification Motions shall be due by June 14, 2023; and a Joint Report on Settlement shall be filed by May 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/11/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
28 28 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Mon 04/10 3:36 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time SECOND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING DEADLINES by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated.(Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 03, 2023
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/03 2:41 PM
ORDER granting26 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Conduct Good Faith Settlement Talks. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the good faith settlement talks deadline shall be extended to April 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/2/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
26 26 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/27 4:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Deadline to Conduct Good Faith Settlement Talks by Ivol Stever.(Pruitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Deadline to Conduct Good Faith Settlement Talks
Friday, February 24, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 02/24 9:31 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. IT IS ORDERED that the deadlines are modified as follows: Class Certification Discovery shall be completed by March 26, 2023; Class Certification Motions shall be due by April 23, 2023; Responses to Class Certification Motions shall be due by May 7, 2023; Replies to Class Certification Motions shall be due by May 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/23/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/16 9:51 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery FIRST JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated.(Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order extending Class Certification Deadlines
Friday, February 03, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 02/03 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated. (Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 01/27 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Ivan Mendez, filed by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated. (Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 01/27 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Ivol Stever, filed by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated. (Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 01/19 3:56 PM
ORDER denying19 Stipulation for the Entry of a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/19/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 01/11 8:58 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated.(Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Protective Order
Friday, January 06, 2023
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/06 3:19 PM
NOTICE re: Defendant's Notice of Service of Discovery Requests by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated . (Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/15 3:20 PM
NOTICE re: Defendant's Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated . (Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 11/15 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ivol Stever. (Pruitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/14 10:19 AM
NOTICE re: Filing of Consent to Join Form by Ivol Stever .(Pruitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Consent to Join Form for Ivan Mendez
Thursday, October 20, 2022
14 14 8 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 10/20 12:06 PM
RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 4/19/2024. Dispositive motions due by 5/31/2024. Any motion for class certification due by 3/24/2023; any response due by 4/7/2023; any reply due by 4/14/2023. See attached Orde for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/20/2022. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 10/20 12:01 PM
ORDER that the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for October 28, 2022 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/20/2022. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Thu 10/20 11:21 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ivol Stever.(Pruitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Rule 16 Case Management Order
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/18 4:54 PM
ORDER that the Rule 26(f) Case Management Report10 is stricken. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file a Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order, in the manner set forth in the Court's September 26, 2022 Order Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference (Doc.9 ), no later than October 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/18/2022. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
10 10 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Mon 10/17 4:12 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ivol Stever. (Pruitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
9 9 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 09/26 11:08 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See attached PDF for complete details . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/23/22.(MJW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Friday, September 16, 2022
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/16 4:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated. (Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/16 4:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated.(Ritenour, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
6 6 service Service Executed Tue 09/06 4:32 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ivol Stever: Return of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, FLSA Complaint & Preliminary Order upon Duane L Standage on August 30, 2022. (Pruitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
5 5 5 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Tue 08/09 9:31 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/9/22. (MJW)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/09 3:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Classy Closets, Etc. Incorporated. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 08/09 3:53 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20967443. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 22-1337 PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 08/09 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Ivol Stever. (Pruitt, Michael) (MYE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/09 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20967443 filed by Ivol Stever. (Pruitt, Michael)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent Form for Ivol Stever