Original Case: 4:22-cv-00590

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cr-20408
Typecivil rights / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2022
Terminated:Aug 31, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Sep 01, 2022 3:31 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Snap, Incorporated, doing business as Snapchat, L.L.C., doing business as Snap, L.L.C.
Represented By
Heather A. Kabele
Kane Russell Coleman & Logan, P.C.
contact info
Eileen M. Ahern
Willenken, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Bonnie Guess-Mazock
Represented By
Janet L. Rushing
Greer, Herz & Adams, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Conroe Independent School District, Conroe I.S.D.
Represented By
Alexa Gould
Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
John Doe, through Next Friend Jane Roe
Represented By
Derek Shawn Merman
Heard Merman, P.L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/01/2022 3:31 AM CDT
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. John Doe 22-20408 (SDH)
Related: [-]