Delaware District Court
Judge:Mark A Kearney
Case #: 1:22-cv-01047
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2022
Terminated:Apr 20, 2023
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:22-cv-00514
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2023 8:18 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Matthew Baer
Represented By
Laurence I. Gross
contact info
Cross Claimant
Jerome E. Powell, Jr.
Represented By
Laurence I. Gross
contact info
Cross Claimant
JGDB Transport, LLC
Cross Defendant
Jerome E. Powell, Jr.
Represented By
Laurence I. Gross
contact info
Cross Defendant
Matthew Baer
Represented By
Laurence I. Gross
contact info
Cross Defendant
Giumarra Vineyards Corp.
Cross Defendant
JGDB Transport, LLC
Cross Defendant
Innovative Transport Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Laurence I. Gross
contact info
Defendant
John Does #1-10
Defendant
Jerome E. Powell, Jr.
Represented By
William A. Crawford
Franklin & Prokopik
contact info
Laurence I. Gross
contact info
Defendant
JGDB Transport, LLC
Represented By
Delia A Clark
Law Offices Of Michelle D. Allen
contact info
Joelle Florax
Rawle & Henderson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Innovative Transport Limited Liability Company
Represented By
William A. Crawford
Franklin & Prokopik
contact info
Laurence I. Gross
contact info
Defendant
Giumarra Vineyards Corp.
Represented By
Vlada Tasich
contact info
Kevin J. Connors
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Baer
Represented By
William A. Crawford
Franklin & Prokopik
contact info
Laurence I. Gross
contact info
Defendant
ABC Corporations 1-10
Plaintiff
Deta Hill
718 E. 7TH ST.
WILMINGTON, DE 19801
Represented By
Kenneth F Carmine
Law Offices Kenneth F. Carmine, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
85 85 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/20 9:34 AM
ORDER: Upon considering the parties' Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice (D.I.84 ) following our April 20, 2023 Dismissal (D.I.83 ), it is ORDERED all claims and crossclaims are DISMISSED with prejudice consistent with the parties' Stipulation (D.I.84 ). Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 06/20/2023. (smg)
Related: [-]