Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:22-cv-01818
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2022
Terminated:Oct 03, 2022
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2023 2:32 PM EST
Defendant
CBW Bank
Represented By
Sara Lauren Solano
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Centrinex, LLC
Defendant
Propel Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Sara Lauren Solano
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Shuey
Represented By
Brandon David Morgan
Seraph Legal, P.A.
contact info
Thomas Martin Bonan
Seraph Legal P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Monday, October 24, 2022
order Order dismissing case Mon 10/24 4:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: In accord with the plaintiff's notice (Doc. 16 ), the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/24/2022. (KRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Fri 10/21 9:49 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Robert Shuey (Morgan, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
order Order Mon 10/03 3:17 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The plaintiff announces (Doc. 14 ) a settlement. Under Local Rule 3.09(b), this action is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days (1) to submit a stipulated form of final order or (2) to move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The clerk must close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/3/2022. (KRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of settlement Tue 09/27 2:46 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Robert Shuey (Morgan, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/15 9:24 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The unopposed motion (Doc. 12 ) to extend the response deadline is GRANTED. Not later than OCTOBER 12, 2022, the defendants must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/15/2022. (KRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/12 2:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by CBW Bank, Propel Holdings, Inc. (Solano, Sara) Modified on 9/12/2022 (CTR)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/12 1:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by CBW Bank, Propel Holdings, Inc. (Solano, Sara) Modified on 9/12/2022 (CTR)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 09/12 1:57 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by CBW Bank, Propel Holdings, Inc. Related case(s): No (Solano, Sara) Modified on 9/12/2022 (CTR)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Mon 09/12 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Lauren Solano on behalf of CBW Bank, Propel Holdings, Inc. (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
8 8 service Summons returned executed Thu 09/01 1:56 PM
RETURN of service executed on August 22, 2022 by Robert Shuey as to CBW Bank. (Morgan, Brandon)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons returned executed Thu 09/01 1:55 PM
RETURN of service executed on August 22, 2022 by Robert Shuey as to Propel Holdings, Inc.. (Morgan, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/12 9:45 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Robert Shuey. (Morgan, Brandon)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 08/12 9:44 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Robert Shuey. Related case(s): No (Morgan, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 08/11 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
3 3 service Summons issued Wed 08/10 12:02 PM
SUMMONS issued as to CBW Bank, Centrinex, LLC, Propel Holdings, Inc. (CTR)
Related: [-]
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-1818-SDM-JSS. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/10 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19867353) filed by Robert Shuey.(Morgan, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons (Propel Holdings, Inc.),
Att: 4 Proposed Summons (CBW Bank),
Att: 5 Proposed Summons (Centrinex, LLC)
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/10 11:06 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-1818-SDM-JSS. (SJB)
Related: [-]