Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:22-cv-00351
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Jun 09, 2022
Terminated:Jun 06, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 11, 2022 11:04 PM EDT
Petitioner
Dusti Nicole Broxson
4096 Woodfin Circle
Milton, FL 32571
Respondent
Warden, RRM Orlando
Represented By
Roberta J. Bodnar
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
18 18 2 pgs misc Judgment - Prisoner Tue 06/06 8:40 AM
JUDGMENT entered dismissing case without prejudice. Civil appeals checklist attached. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (HAI)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
17 17 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/05 3:56 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice for Petitioner's lack of prosecution. The Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing this case, terminate any pending motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/5/2023. (KLM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order to show cause Mon 05/15 4:23 PM
ORDER to show cause why this case should not be dismissed as moot as to Dusti Nicole Broxson. Show cause response due within 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/15/2023. (LMF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
15 15 misc Supplement Mon 11/14 2:06 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dusti Nicole Broxson.(RLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
14 14 order Standing order pro se litigants Wed 08/10 4:44 PM
STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/10/2022. (HAI)
Related: [-]
13 13 TRANSFER IN from Orlando Division on 08/09/2022 Case Number 6:22-cv-1024. Case assigned to District Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New Case Number: 5:21-cv-351-BJD-PRL. (HAI)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
12 12 ORDER that this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court, Middle District of Florida, Ocala Division. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/8/2022. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
11 11 4 pgs MEMORANDUM in support re9 Order pdf, filed by Warden, RRM Orlando. (Bodnar, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
10 10 4 pgs MEMORANDUM of Law re9 Order pdf filed by Dusti Nicole Broxson.(KNC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
Monday, July 18, 2022
9 9 ORDER. It is ORDERED that, within ten days from the date of this Order, the parties shall file a memorandum of law discussing why venue of this case should not be in the Ocala Division and whether the Orlando RRM is located at FCC Coleman as alleged by Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 7/18/2022. (TNP)
Related: [-]
8 8 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM re7 Reply to response to petition by Dusti Nicole Broxson.(KNC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
7 7 REPLY re6 Response to habeas petition by Dusti Nicole Broxson.(KNC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
6 6 RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Warden, RRM Orlando.(Bodnar, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Sentry Report,
Att: 2 Appendix Declaration with Exhibits
Friday, June 24, 2022
5 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/24/2022. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
4 4 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:22-cv-1024-WWB-DAB. US Magistrate Judge Gregory J Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (LMW)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberta J. Bodnar on behalf of Warden, RRM Orlando (Bodnar, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
FEES Paid by Dusti Nicole Broxson (Filing fee $5.00, Receipt Number ORL104078). (SRD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
2 2 ORDER. The Government shall, within thirty (30) days file a response indicating why the relief sought in the Petition should not be granted. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Petitioner shall file a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the $5.00 filing fee. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 6/14/2022. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
1 1 7 pgs PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dusti Nicole Broxson.(SPM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope