Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:22-mj-01855
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Aug 11, 2022 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Ashley Marie Bustamante (1)
Represented By
Jackson L. Lindsey
The Lindsey Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 08/11/2022 2:52 AM CDT
Saturday, August 06, 2022
Arrest of Ashly Marie Bustamante (drda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
Warrant Returned Executed as to Ashly Marie Bustamante. (drda)
Related: [-]
True Name of Defendant as to Ashly Marie Bustamante. True name of defendant is: Ashley Marie Bustamante. (ccl)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Ashley Marie Bustamante. (drda)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Ashley Marie Bustamante (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Ashley Marie Bustamante (1).By Judge Victor R. Garcia. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Ashly Marie Bustamante. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Ashly Marie Bustamante. (drda)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Initial Appearance as to Ashly Marie Bustamante held on 8/9/2022 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 8/12/2022 9:00AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia, Interpreter NOT required as to Ashly Marie Bustamante (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - CLEVRIE.) (drda)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Ashley Marie Bustamante. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (drda)
Related: [-]