Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00176
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Aug 11, 2022 3:39 AM EDT
Defendant
DARRELL MCCULLOUGH (1)
Represented By
David B. Chontos
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Katherine C Jordan
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/11/2022 4:22 AM EDT
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
1 1 MOTION to Seal Indictment and Arrest Warrant by USA as to DARRELL MCCULLOUGH. (lar)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Indictment and Arrest Warrant as to DARRELL MCCULLOUGH (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/12/2022. (lar)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED INDICTMENT as to DARRELL MCCULLOUGH (1) counts 1, 2, 3. (lar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arraignment Plea,
Att: 2 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions,
Att: 3 Criminal Case Info Sheet
4 4 Indictment MEMORANDUM as to DARRELL MCCULLOUGH (lar)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to DARRELL MCCULLOUGH. (lar)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion for Arrest Warrant as to DARRELL MCCULLOUGH (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/12/2022. (lar)
Related: [-]