Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Greg Gerard Guidry
Referred: Dana Douglas
Case #: 2:22-cv-02626
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2022
Terminated:Sep 14, 2022
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2023 8:58 AM CST
Defendant
McPherson Oil Company Inc
Plaintiff
Darla Morales
Represented By
Jessica Lynne Ibert
Lewis, Kullman , Sterbcow & Abramson
contact info
Paul M. Sterbcow
Lewis, Kullman , Sterbcow & Abramson
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Morales, III
Represented By
Jessica Lynne Ibert
Lewis, Kullman , Sterbcow & Abramson
contact info
Paul M. Sterbcow
Lewis, Kullman , Sterbcow & Abramson
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/13 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to McPherson Oil Company. Inc. by Darla Morales, Paul Morales, III. (Sterbcow, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/17 10:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; McPherson Oil Company Inc served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Sterbcow, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/12 9:49 AM
Summons Issued as to McPherson Oil Company Inc. (cs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (mb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/11 8:31 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against McPherson Oil Company Inc (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9491712) filed by Paul Morales, III, Darla Morales.Attorney Paul M. Sterbcow added to party Darla Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Paul M. Sterbcow added to party Paul Morales, III(pty:pla).(Sterbcow, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 08/11 11:01 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (mb)
Related: [-]