Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-00816

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:22-ap-00116
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2022
Terminated:Oct 11, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shandra Dawn Gilles
121 Palm Cottage Dr.
Hampstead, NC 28443
Represented By
Shandra Dawn Gilles
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization
1135 Pandion Drive
Wilmington, NC 28411
Represented By
Patrick M. Mincey
Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal
1135 Pandion Drive
Wilmington, NC 28411
Represented By
Patrick M. Mincey
Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
American Leadership Academy Coastal
1135 Pandion Drive
Wilmington, NC 28411
Represented By
Patrick M. Mincey
Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALA Coastal
1135 Pandion Drive
Wilmington, NC 28411
Represented By
Patrick M. Mincey
Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/11 3:45 PM
Adversary Case 5:22-ap-116 Closed (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
utility Calendar - Remove Wed 10/11 3:56 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - Other- Case closed Related [+] (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] ument no.24 Order Setting Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 10/26/2023 at 10:30 AM at Wilmington Courtroom (New).
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
25 25 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/10 2:58 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Patrick M. Mincey on behalf of ALA Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal. (Mincey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
24 24 order Status Conference (Set) Fri 09/29 11:09 AM
Order Setting Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 10/26/2023 at 10:30 AM at Wilmington Courtroom (New). (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
23 23 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Fri 09/29 11:07 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Status Conference (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 01, 2023
utility Note - CA Assignment (Public) Sun 01/01 10:11 PM
NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Ahronda Crossman (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
22 22 order Stay Fri 12/16 12:12 PM
Order Granting Motion to Stay Related [+] (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
21 21 motion Stay Wed 12/14 2:18 PM
Joint Motion to Stay filed by Stephen Bell, Ryan Lee Bostic, Vince Eisinger, Melanie A Huffines, Patrick M. Mincey on behalf of ALA Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal. (Mincey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
20 20 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 11/23 4:48 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Melanie A Huffines on behalf of ALA Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal. (Huffines, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
19 19 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Wed 11/16 8:31 AM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 12/16/2022. . (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
18 18 utility Calendar - Schedule Tue 11/15 12:29 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/14 3:43 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Christopher T. Vonderau on behalf of Shandra Dawn Gilles. (Vonderau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 10/24 5:20 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Lee Bostic on behalf of ALA Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal. (Bostic, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 10/17 12:54 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Answer deadline update Related [+] (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] ument no.15 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, October 06, 2022
15 15 order Extend Time Thu 10/06 7:14 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 10/14/2022. (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
14 14 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Wed 10/05 7:29 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Christopher T. Vonderau. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 10/17/2022. (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] ument no.13 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Shandra Dawn Gilles
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
13 13 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Tue 10/04 1:47 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Christopher T. Vonderau on behalf of Shandra Dawn Gilles Related [+]. (Vonderau, Christopher)
Related: [-] ument no.10 Summons Reissued
Thursday, September 22, 2022
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 09/22 11:45 AM
Summons Service Executed on Shandra Dawn Gilles 9/13/2022. filed by Vince Eisinger on behalf of ALA Coastal ; American Leadership Academy Coastal ; Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization ; Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal. (Eisinger, Vince)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
11 11 order Amended Motion/Application Mon 09/12 4:17 PM
Order Granting Motion Related [+] Answer due by 10/11/2022. (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] 8
10 10 court Summons Reissued Mon 09/12 1:29 PM
Summons Reissued on Shandra Dawn Gilles Date Issued 9/12/2022, Answer Due 10/12/2022 (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
9 9 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Fri 09/09 3:48 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Patrick Mincey. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 9/19/2022. (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] ument no.2 Summons Issued on Shandra Dawn Gilles Answer Due 09/9/2022 filed by Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, ALA Coastal
8 8 motion Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application Fri 09/09 3:36 PM
Amended/Amendment to Motion/Application filed by Christopher T. Vonderau on behalf of Shandra Dawn Gilles Related [+]. (Vonderau, Christopher)
Related: [-] ument no.7 Motion to Extend
7 7 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Fri 09/09 2:42 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Christopher T. Vonderau on behalf of Shandra Dawn Gilles. (Vonderau, Christopher) **Amended by docket entry8 .** Modified on 9/12/2022 (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 08/23 4:30 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher T. Vonderau on behalf of Shandra Dawn Gilles. (Vonderau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 08/22 12:29 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Vince Eisinger on behalf of ALA Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal. (Eisinger, Vince)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 08/22 12:27 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Bell on behalf of ALA Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal. (Bell, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
3 3 admis Client Disclosure Statement Wed 08/10 2:37 PM
Client Disclosure Statement filed by Patrick M. Mincey on behalf of ALA Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal. (Mincey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/10 2:22 PM
Summons Issued on Shandra Dawn Gilles Answer Due 09/9/2022 (Mincey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/10 2:22 PM
Adversary case 22-00116 5. Complaint by Board of Directors of Wilmington Education Organization, Wilmington Education Organization d/b/a American Leadership Academy-Coastal, American Leadership Academy Coastal, ALA Coastal against Shandra Dawn Gilles (Fee Paid) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Mincey, Patrick)
Related: [-]