Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:22-cv-01282
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2022
Re-opened:Jan 31, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2023
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2023 9:24 AM PST
Defendant
Michael B Scoma
17606 Cobblestone Lane
Clermont, FL 34711
Defendant
Scoma Law Firm, PLLC
17606 Cobblestone Lane
Clermont, FL 34711
Plaintiff
Tyler Wright
Represented By
Joseph P Garin
Lipson Neilson P.C.
contact info
Megan H Thongkham
Lipson Neilson Cole Seltzer & Garin PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
33 33 notice Notice Other Wed 09/27 9:38 AM
NOTICE Clerk's Certification of a Judgment by Tyler Wright.. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
misc QC Notice Wed 09/27 3:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required as to ECF No.33 . Counsel is advised to complete a Copy and Service Request form located on our Court's website in order to obtain a certified copy of a document. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
32 32 misc Costs Taxed Tue 06/20 2:09 PM
COSTS TAXED in the amount of $ $677.00 against Defendants re31 Bill of Costs. (LG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
31 31 misc Bill of Costs Wed 05/24 2:16 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiff Tyler Wright. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 6/7/2023. Tax Bill of Costs by 6/14/2023. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
30 30 order Judgment Wed 05/10 1:26 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Tyler Wright and against Scoma Law Firm, PLLC, and Michael B Scoma. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Case Wed 05/10 1:18 PM
ORDER. It is THEREFORE ORDERED the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff Tyler Wright and against Defendants Michael B. Scoma and Scoma Law Firm, PLLC, joint and several, in the amount of $10,278,362.84. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
28 28 misc Supplement Fri 05/05 8:37 AM
SUPPLEMENT to26 Motion for Default Judgment as Authorized by ECF No. 27 by Plaintiff Tyler Wright(Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 04/25 1:18 PM
ORDER. It Is Therefore Ordered that the motion for default judgment26 is granted in part. Plaintiff Tyler Wright is entitled to judgment against defendants Michael B. Scoma and Scoma Law Firm, PLLC, jointly and severally, in the amount of $9,725,287.09. It Is Further Ordered that Wright may file a supplemental brief calculating the amount of prejudgment interest by May 5, 2023. The clerk will not enter judgment until I determine the amount of prejudgment interest to award. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/25/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
26 26 motion Motion Default Judgment Tue 04/18 8:36 AM
Second MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Tyler Wright. Responses due by 5/2/2023.(Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 04/13 10:49 AM
ORDER Denying without Prejudice24 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
24 24 motion Motion Default Judgment Fri 03/31 3:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Tyler Wright. Responses due by 4/14/2023.(Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joseph Garin,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Tyler Wright,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Bill of Costs,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Default Judgment
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
23 23 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 01/31 11:38 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael B Scoma and Scoma Law Firm, PLLC per21 Order. (TRW)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Judgment Default Tue 01/31 7:21 AM
Entered in error. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Tyler Wright against Scoma Law Firm, PLLC, Michael B Scoma. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) Modified on 1/31/2023 (TRW)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default Order on Report and Recommendation Tue 01/31 7:19 AM
ORDER that Magistrate Judge Koppes report and recommendation (ECF No.20 ) is accepted and the plaintiffs motions for entry of clerks default (ECF Nos.17 ,18 ) are GRANTED. The clerk of court is instructed to enter default as to defendants Michael B. Scoma and the Scoma Law Firm. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/30/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
20 20 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 12/28 11:14 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Docket Nos.15 ,17 ,18 ). The Court RECOMMENDS that default be entered against Defendants Michael B. Scoma and Scoma Law Firm, PLLC. The Court further RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's motions for default be granted. Objections to R&R due by 1/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Fri 11/18 10:04 AM
ORDER Denying as moot12 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
18 18 motion Motion Entry of Clerks Default Thu 11/10 10:20 AM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendants for Repeated Violations of the Court's Orders re13 Order on Motion to Strike,,,15 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Tyler Wright. Responses due by 11/24/2022.(Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
17 17 motion Motion Entry of Clerks Default Thu 11/10 10:18 AM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Scoma Law Frim, PLLC re13 Order on Motion to Strike,,, by Plaintiff Tyler Wright. Responses due by 11/24/2022.(Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Monday, October 31, 2022
16 16 notice Notice Other Mon 10/31 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Non-Compliance and Request for Sanctions Including Striking Defendants' Responsive Pleadings and Entering Defaults by Tyler Wright re14 Order on Motion,,,,,.. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Show Cause Mon 10/24 12:13 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re12 Motion to Strike. The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants must show cause in writing, no later than 11/4/2022, as to why they have failed to meaningfully pa1ticipate in the discove1y plan process and why default and/or other sanctions should not be entered against them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/24 12:10 PM
ORDER Denying11 Motion to enter discovery plan without prejudice. Defendants must meet and confer with Plaintiff no later than 10/27/2022, and a joint proposed discove1y plan must be submitted no later than 10/28/2022. In addition to the normal requirements for discove1y plans, the amended discove1y plan must also include a certification that Defendants have read Local Rule 26 in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Mon 10/24 11:57 AM
ORDER Granting6 Motion to Strike. Scoma Law Firm, PLLC must retain counsel and file an answer no later than 11/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
12 12 motion Motion Strike Fri 10/21 12:33 PM
MOTION to Strike5 Answer to Complaint,4 Answer to Complaint, by Plaintiff Tyler Wright. Responses due by 11/4/2022.(Garin, Joseph) (answer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
11 11 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/21 12:30 PM
MOTION to Enter Discovery Plan and For an Order Under Rule 37(f) by Plaintiff Tyler Wright. Responses due by 11/4/2022.(Garin, Joseph) (misc) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, October 17, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 10/17 12:28 PM
ORDER Denying9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. A Properly formatted Joint Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
9 9 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 10/14 2:24 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tyler Wright.. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/06 4:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Wright. Michael B Scoma served on 8/20/2022. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/06 4:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Wright. Scoma Law Firm, PLLC served on 8/20/2022. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion Strike Thu 10/06 11:51 AM
MOTION to Strike4 Answer to Complaint, by Plaintiff Tyler Wright. Responses due by 10/20/2022. (Garin, Joseph) (answer)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/13 10:43 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Michael B Scoma.(TRW)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/13 10:42 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Scoma Law Firm, PLLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/27/2022.(TRW)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/12 8:37 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael B Scoma, Scoma Law Firm, PLLC re1 Complaint. (KF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, August 11, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/11 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT against Michael B Scoma, Scoma Law Firm, PLLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7006757) by Tyler Wright. Proof of service due by 11/9/2022. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - M. Scoma,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - Scoma Law Firm
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 08/12 8:34 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (KF)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Fri 08/12 8:35 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]