Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-11237
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Feb 16, 2023 4:09 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
JOSEPH GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ
Represented By
ADAM BRYAN WOLFSON
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Etc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 08/18 4:10 PM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number FLN400044823. Fee status updated to paid. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/12 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ JOSEPH. (WOLFSON, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet