New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:22-cv-04975
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2022
Re-opened:Sep 09, 2022
Terminated:Oct 31, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 05, 2023 5:11 AM EST
Defendant
RONALD BOOKBINDER
Represented By
THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR
Office Of The Attorney General Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
BURLINGTON COUNTY
Represented By
DANIEL GEE
Malamut And Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CORPS A-Z
Defendant
JOHN HARRINGTON
Represented By
THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR
Office Of The Attorney General Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOE 1-20
Defendant
PETER MILLIGAN
Defendant
JENIFER RAFFA
Defendant
TRAVIS RICHARDS
Defendant
MICHELLE M. SMITH
Represented By
THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR
Office Of The Attorney General Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
SUPERIOR COURT CLERK'S OFFICE
Represented By
THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR
Office Of The Attorney General Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
KIRBY WU
Defendant
WU & ASSOCIATES
Defendant
BURLINGTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE
Represented By
DANIEL GEE
Malamut And Associates, LLC
contact info
THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR
Office Of The Attorney General Of New Jersey
contact info
Plaintiff
TARA LYNN SHINDLE
126 Augusta Dr
Moorestown, NJ 08057

GPO Jul 17 2023
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 30, 34 Motions for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 7/17/2023. (dmr)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
40 40 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (4m, 41.1) Tue 10/31 12:01 PM
Order for Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 10/31/23. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
39 39 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Tue 10/17 1:04 PM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 10/31/2023 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 07/17 12:39 PM
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's30 ,34 Motions for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 7/17/2023. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
37 37 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 05/02 3:40 PM
Letter from TARA LYN SHINDLE regarding request for default judgment. Related [+](dmr)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
Monday, April 24, 2023
36 36 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 04/24 4:25 PM
ORDER granting the Judiciary Defendants'21 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against the Judiciary Defendants are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 4/24/2023. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
35 35 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/06 2:27 PM
LETTER ORDER granting Defendant Burlington County and Burlington County Courthouse's5 Motion to Dismiss. Ms. Shindle's claims against the County and its courthouse are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 4/6/2023. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/05 10:51 AM
Set Deadlines as to30 MOTION for Default Judgment. Set for 5/1/2023 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
34 34 3 pgs motion Default Judgment Wed 03/29 10:38 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by TARA LYN SHINDLE.(dmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 2 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit Milligan,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit Richards,
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit Wu
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
33 33 order Order Tue 03/28 4:19 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, (ECF No. 32), filed out of time under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a). Because it is out of time, the Court interprets the pleading as a Motion for Leave to Amend, which it DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE and TERMINATES for failure to comport with Local Civil Rule 15.1. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, she may file a proper motion pursuant to the Local and Federal Civil Rules within the next seven (7) days. Unless and until she does so, her original Complaint, (ECF No. 1), shall remain the operative pleading. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 3/28/23. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
32 32 51 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/15 3:25 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against RONALD BOOKBINDER, BURLINGTON COUNTY, BURLINGTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE, JOHN HARRINGTON, PETER MILLIGAN, JENIFER RAFFA, TRAVIS RICHARDS, MICHELLE M. SMITH, SUPERIOR COURT CLERK'S OFFICE, KIRBY WU, WU & ASSOCIATES filed by TARA LYNN SHINDLE.(ssp, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Non-Military Service
31 31 misc Affidavit Tue 03/14 3:52 PM
AFFIDAVITS of Non Military Service submitted by TARA LYNN SHINDLE. Related [+] (dmr)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Affidavit re Richards,
Att: 2 Affidavit re Wu
30 30 3 pgs motion Default Judgment Tue 03/14 3:45 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by TARA LYNN SHINDLE. Related [+] (dmr) Modified on 3/14/2023 (dmr, )
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/14 3:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to30 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment. Motion set for 4/17/2023 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
29 29 misc Letter Wed 03/01 10:52 AM
Letter re5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (GEE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
28 28 order Order Mon 11/21 12:01 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Proposed Order to Show Cause, (ECF No.25 ), through which she appears to seek injunctive relief pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 65. Specifically, Plaintiff requests the entry of an injunction granting her access to the property that is the subject of her underlying dispute with Defendant Wu & Associates, which is and/or was the subject of proceedings in the Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County. However, this matter does not concern that dispute--here, Plaintiff seeks to assert claims under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. § 1692 et seq. As the Court has continuously explained to Plaintiff, it lacks jurisdiction to adjudicate landlord-tenant matters. See Wu & Assocs., Inc. v. Shindle, No. 22-5605 (D.N.J. Sept. 21, 2022) (order remanding case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction). Because the Court lacks the power to grant Plaintiff her requested relief even if she were to succeed on her claims, the Court cannot grant her preliminary injunctive relief as to the same. Accordingly, her request is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 11/21/22. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
27 27 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 11/18 11:57 AM
Exhibit B to25 Proposed Pretrial Order by TARA LYNN SHINDLE. Related [+](dmr)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
26 26 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 11/18 11:52 AM
Exhibit C to25 Proposed Pretrial Order by TARA LYNN SHINDLE. Related [+](dmr)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Exhibit D
25 25 misc Proposed Order Fri 11/18 11:46 AM
Proposed Order to Show Cause Injunctive Relief by TARA LYNN SHINDLE. Related [+] (dmr) Modified on 11/18/2022 (dmr, )
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Order to Show Cause,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Thursday, November 10, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/10 8:45 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to21 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of all Judiciary Defendants and . Motion set for 12/19/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
24 24 order Order Wed 11/09 3:28 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff Tara Shindle's Letter, (ECF No.23 ), which appears to request an adjournment of the Judicial Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No.21 ). For good cause shown, that request is GRANTED. The Judicial Defendants' Motion shall be reset for December 19, 2022. Accordingly, Plaintiff's response shall be due by December 5, 2022, and any reply the Judicial Defendants may wish to file shall be due December 12, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 11/9/22. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
23 23 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 11/09 10:53 AM
Letter from TARA LYNN SHINDLE addressed to Judge O'Hearn. (dmr) Related [+]
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
22 22 misc Letter Wed 10/05 4:09 PM
Letter from Daniel Gee, Esq.. (GEE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/30 11:40 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to21 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of all Judiciary Defendants and . Motion set for 11/7/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
21 21 motion Dismiss Thu 09/29 6:13 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of all Judiciary Defendants and by RONALD BOOKBINDER. Responses due by 10/24/2022 (SINDEL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/29 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR on behalf of JOHN HARRINGTON (SINDEL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/29 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR on behalf of BURLINGTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE (SINDEL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/29 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR on behalf of RONALD BOOKBINDER (SINDEL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/29 5:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS FRANCIS SINDEL, JR on behalf of MICHELLE M. SMITH, SUPERIOR COURT CLERK'S OFFICE (SINDEL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Tue 09/13 1:56 PM
Letter requesting oral argument from Tara Shindle. Received via ECF help desk (jab)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/09 3:07 PM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendant's14 request to reinstate Defendant's5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 9/9/2022. (mag)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/09 3:14 PM
Reset Deadlines as to5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
14 14 misc Letter Thu 09/08 2:46 PM
Letter from Daniel Gee, Esq.. (GEE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 09/08 10:24 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court, having reviewed the September 7, 2022 Letter of the Plaintiff (ECF No.12 ), will consider Plaintiff's previously filed Notice of Removal and Counterclaim (ECF No.1 ) as an original complaint. The Clerk is hereby directed to re-open this case. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 9/8/22. (Minix, H)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
12 12 misc Letter Wed 09/07 2:39 PM
Letter from TARA LYNN SHINDLE requesting to reopen case as an original proceeding initially filed by the Clerk's Office. (dmr) Related [+] Modified on 9/7/2022 (dmr, )
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Helpdesk
order Order Wed 09/07 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's September 6, 2022 letter requesting this case be reopened as a Notice of Removal (ECF No. 10). For all the reasons set forth in this Court's prior Order dated September 6, 2022 (ECF No. 9), Plaintiff's request to re-open the case as a Notice of Removal is denied. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 9/7/22. (Minix, H)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
10 10 misc Letter Tue 09/06 4:45 PM
Letter Requesting to Reopen Case as a Notice of Removal from TARA LYNN SHINDLE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (mag)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Show Cause Tue 09/06 2:46 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING this case; if Plaintiff wishes to REOPEN this case, Plaintiff may notify the Court within thirty (30) days by written letter; Dismissing WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants'5 Motion to Dismiss; Dismissing WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's7 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 9/6/2022. (mag)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Tue 09/06 10:27 AM
Letter requesting D.E.1 labeled Notice of Removal and Counterclaim from Tara Shindle. (dmw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 09/06 10:35 AM
The Clerk's office has renamed document1 from Complaint to Notice of Removal with Counterclaims by request of plaintiff Tara Shindle by letter8 . (dmw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/06 2:50 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mag)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
7 7 motion Show Cause Fri 09/02 4:42 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause Notice of Removal by TARA LYNN SHINDLE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (mag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
6 6 misc Letter Fri 09/02 4:24 PM
Letter of Clarification regarding Notice of Removal from TARA LYNN SHINDLE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (mag)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/02 4:44 PM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/30 10:06 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
5 5 motion Dismiss Mon 08/29 4:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BURLINGTON COOUNTY COURTHOUSE, BURLINGTON COUNTY.(GEE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief ISO Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Order,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of Service
Thursday, August 11, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 08/11 1:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to RONALD BOOKBINDER, BURLINGTON COOUNTY COURTHOUSE, BURLINGTON COUNTY, JOHN HARRINGTON, PETER MILLIGAN, JENIFER RAFFA, TRAVIS RICHARDS, MICHELLE M. SMITH, SUPERIOR COURT CLERK'S OFFICE, KIRBY WU, WU & ASSOCIATES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Non-Prisoner Pro Se Filers Thu 08/11 1:20 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (ssp, )
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 08/11 2:26 PM
Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number CAM013942 (ssp, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/11 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Consent and Registration to Receive Documents Electronically by TARA LYNN SHINDLE (ssp, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/11 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT against RONALD BOOKBINDER, BURLINGTON COOUNTY COURTHOUSE, BURLINGTON COUNTY, JOHN HARRINGTON, PETER MILLIGAN, JENIFER RAFFA, TRAVIS RICHARDS, MICHELLE M. SMITH, SUPERIOR COURT CLERK'S OFFICE, KIRBY WU, WU & ASSOCIATES (Filing and Admin fee $ 402, awaiting receipt # from finance.), filed by TARA LYNN SHINDLE.(ssp, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Memorandum of fact, agreement, and law,
Att: 3 IFP (fee paid),
Att: 4 Exhibits A to Q,
Att: 5 Exhibits R to V-1,
Att: 6 Certification,
Att: 7 Notice of Motion