North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 7:22-cv-00141
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2022
Terminated:Dec 20, 2022
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2023 8:16 AM EST
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
John A. Bain
U. S. Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Frederick Gaston Hall
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandra Cline
Represented By
Eric W. Flynn
Bell Legal Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Perry
Represented By
Eric W. Flynn
Bell Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
17 17 order Judgment Tue 12/20 11:10 AM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE plaintiffs' complaint for failure to exhaust administrative remedies under section 804(h) of the Camp Lejeune Justice Act. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/20/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
16 16 18 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/20 11:07 AM
Order Dismissing Case - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/20/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
notice Notice to Counsel Fri 11/18 3:12 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:14 Response. A courtesy copy was received by the court, however, it was a double-sided copy. In the future, please only send single-sided courtesy copies. No need to re-send at this time. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
15 15 respm Response Thu 11/17 12:23 PM
RESPONSE regarding12 Response,14 Response, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Responsive Memorandum on Administrative Exhaustion filed by Sandra Cline, Mark Perry. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
14 14 respm Response to Order Thu 11/10 3:12 PM
RESPONSE to Order regarding12 Response,11 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by United States of America. (Hall, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 1st Russell Declaration (Oct. 13 2022),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Corrected 2d Russell Declaration (Nov. 10, 2022)
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/02 1:50 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Gaston Hall on behalf of United States of America. (Hall, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
notice Notice of Correction Tue 10/25 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding:12 Response. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). Case manager has added the exhibit descriptions this time, however, please remember this rule when filing in the future. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
12 12 respm Response to Order Fri 10/21 1:23 PM
RESPONSE to Order regarding11 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON ADMINISTRATIVE EXHAUSTION filed by Sandra Cline, Mark Perry. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Thursday, September 29, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Thu 09/29 2:40 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/29/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
10 10 misc Affidavit Thu 09/01 4:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint by Sandra Cline, Mark Perry (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Registry Receipt
Monday, August 29, 2022
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 08/29 10:49 AM
Summons Returned Executed by Process Server filed by Sandra Cline, Mark Perry as to United States of America served on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/16/2022. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
8 8 16 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 08/26 3:32 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding7 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sandra Cline, Mark Perry. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 08/26 3:31 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sandra Cline, Mark Perry. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/26 10:18 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Bain on behalf of United States of America. (Bain, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 08/12 3:56 PM
Summonses Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 08/11 8:19 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Mark Perry (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 08/11 8:19 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Sandra Cline (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/11 8:18 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/11 8:18 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6674081.), filed by Sandra Cline, Mark Perry. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons