Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:22-cv-01164
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2022
Terminated:Aug 28, 2023
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2023 1:28 PM EST
Defendant
JOY E. BOCHNER
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Defendant
FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Defendant
FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Defendant
FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Defendant
REBECCA L. MYERS
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Defendant
DIETRICH A. STEPHAN
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN DEMARCO
Represented By
Steven E. Winslow
Jubelirer, Pass & Intrieri, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEX FITZGERALD
Represented By
Steven E. Winslow
Jubelirer, Pass & Intrieri, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
CLINT GOODENOW
Represented By
Steven E. Winslow
Jubelirer, Pass & Intrieri, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON HUMMEL
Represented By
Steven E. Winslow
Jubelirer, Pass & Intrieri, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK WILLIAMS
Represented By
Steven E. Winslow
Jubelirer, Pass & Intrieri, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Defendant
FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Defendant
FRX GROWTH, LLC
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info

GPO Mar 07 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 3/7/23. (eca)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 28, 2023
39 39 order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 08/28 1:08 PM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of38 Stipulation of Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/28/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Stipulation Mon 08/28 11:03 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by BRIAN DEMARCO, ALEX FITZGERALD, CLINT GOODENOW, JASON HUMMEL, MARK WILLIAMS. (Winslow, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
37 37 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 08/10 8:21 AM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of36 Report of Mediation, all deadlines in this matter are TERMINATED. The Court will await the filing of a stipulation of dismissal to close this case. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/10/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
36 36 adr Report of Mediation Wed 08/09 1:56 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Mediation held on 8/8/2023. Case has been resolved. KENNETH BENSON terminated. Attorney Kenneth J. Benson terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and return same to the Clerk of Court within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. (Benson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
35 35 order Protective Order Thu 06/15 7:51 AM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY and QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/14/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
34 34 misc Stipulated Protective Order Wed 06/14 10:04 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER by JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, April 24, 2023
33 33 order Case Management Order Mon 04/24 12:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 05/08/2023; Amended Pleadings due by 05/31/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 05/31/2023; Expert Reports due by 11/25/2023; Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 12/15/2023; Discovery due by 01/31/2024; Summary Judgment due by 02/14/2024; Response to Summary Judgment due by 03/14/2024; Reply brief due by 03/28/2024. Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 01/31/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/24/2023. (rgm)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 04/24 12:32 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Kenneth Benson is appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/24/2023. (rgm)
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Mon 04/24 12:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 04/24/2023. (Court Reporter: None) (rgm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
30 30 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 04/19 7:33 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
29 29 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Wed 04/19 7:32 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/21 2:06 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 4/12/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 4/19/2023. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 03/21/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/21 1:45 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint, by JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/07 9:48 AM
ORDER DENYING16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 3/7/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
25 25 15 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 03/07 9:47 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 3/7/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
24 24 respm Reply Brief Tue 02/07 11:57 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support re16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN. (Tuite, Jaime) Modified text on 2/7/2023 to correct document linkage. (kss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
23 23 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/31 6:23 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by BRIAN DEMARCO, ALEX FITZGERALD, CLINT GOODENOW, JASON HUMMEL, MARK WILLIAMS. (Winslow, Steven)
Related: [-]
22 22 respoth Response in Opposition Tue 01/31 6:22 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to18 Errata,16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by BRIAN DEMARCO, ALEX FITZGERALD, CLINT GOODENOW, JASON HUMMEL, MARK WILLIAMS. (Winslow, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Tue 01/10 12:12 PM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Response to18 Motion to Dismiss due by 1/31/2023; Reply due by 2/7/2023. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/10/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 01/10 12:06 PM
ORDER APPROVING15 Stipulation of Dismissal. FRX GROWTH, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC and FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/10/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
19 19 misc Errata Mon 01/09 8:55 PM
Errata re17 Brief in Support of Motion, DEFENDANTS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6)FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) by JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN. Reason for Correction: Incorrect PDF Version Upload. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Errata Mon 01/09 8:54 PM
Errata re16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) by JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN. Reason for Correction: Incorrect PDF Version Upload. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 01/09 2:52 PM
BRIEF in Support re16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, DEFENDANTS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/09 2:51 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) re10 Amended Complaint,,, by FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Mon 01/09 2:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) by FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/16 12:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead on or before 01/09/23. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/16/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/15 10:54 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC. (Lewis, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, November 21, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/21 6:32 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC Answer due from All Defendants. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/14 9:17 AM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon the filing of10 Amended Complaint,7 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/14/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/11 7:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN JOY E. BOCHNER answer due 11/25/2022; FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC answer due 11/25/2022; FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC answer due 11/25/2022; FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC answer due 11/25/2022; FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC answer due 11/25/2022; FRX GROWTH, LLC answer due 11/25/2022; FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC answer due 11/25/2022; REBECCA L. MYERS answer due 11/25/2022; DIETRICH A. STEPHAN answer due 11/25/2022, filed by CLINT GOODENOW; JASON HUMMEL; ALEX FITZGERALD; BRIAN DEMARCO; MARK WILLIAMS. (Winslow, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1
Monday, October 24, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Mon 10/24 7:59 AM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Response to7 Motion to Dismiss due by 11/14/2022; Reply due by 11/21/2022. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/24/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
8 8 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 10/21 2:27 PM
BRIEF in Support re7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/21 2:23 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) re1 Complaint, by FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Fri 10/21 2:19 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/21 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Lewis on behalf of FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC. (Lewis, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 08/25 10:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN, JOY E. BOCHNER, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC. All Defendants. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/23 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime S. Tuite on behalf of JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/12 11:41 AM
Summons Issued as to JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons FarmaceuticalRX GP of Pennsylvania, LLC,
Att: 2 Summons FarmaceuticalRX Real Estate Pennsylvania, LLC,
Att: 3 Summons FarmaceuticalRX, LLC,
Att: 4 Summons FRX Growth Partners, LLC,
Att: 5 Summons FRX Growth, LLC,
Att: 6 Summons FRX Management Holdings, LLC,
Att: 7 Summons Rebecca L. Myers,
Att: 8 Summons Dietrich A. Stephan
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Fri 08/12 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against JOY E. BOCHNER, FARMACEUTICALRX GP OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX REAL ESTATE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, FARMACEUTICALRX, LLC, FRX GROWTH PARTNERS, LLC, FRX GROWTH, LLC, FRX MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, REBECCA L. MYERS, DIETRICH A. STEPHAN (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7241229), filed by CLINT GOODENOW, JASON HUMMEL, ALEX FITZGERALD, BRIAN DEMARCO, MARK WILLIAMS. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet