Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-30175

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:22-ap-03024
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2022
Terminated:Sep 16, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
RPM Auto Sales, Inc.
4083 N. Dort Highway
Flint, MI 48506
Represented By
RPM Auto Sales, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Chelsey H Slater
3313 Sunnybrook
Burton, MI 48519
Represented By
Michael T. Brown
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah E Slater
3313 Sunnybrook
Burton, MI 48519
Represented By
Michael T. Brown
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, September 16, 2022
7 7 order Default Judgment Fri 09/16 2:32 PM
Default Judgment Against RPM Auto Sales, Inc. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 6 Motion For Default Judgment
6 6 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/16 1:49 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiffs Chelsey H Slater, Sarah E Slater (Brown, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 09/16 8:50 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of RPM Auto Sales, Inc. - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/30/2022. (kcm)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 09/16 2:33 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:22-ap-3024 : Granted by Default Judgment. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/16 2:35 PM
Adversary Case 4:22-ap-3024 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
4 4 misc Notice of Debtor(s) Address Change Wed 08/31 2:33 PM
Notice of Debtor(s) Address Change 2772 Tim Avenue, Brighton, MI 48114 Plaintiffs Chelsey H Slater, Sarah E Slater. (Beard, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/12 12:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on RPM Auto Sales, Inc. 8/12/2022 (Brown, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/12 11:57 AM
Summons Issued on RPM Auto Sales, Inc. Answer Due 09/12/2022 (Brown, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/12 11:57 AM
Adversary case 22-03024 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Chelsey H Slater, Sarah E Slater against RPM Auto Sales, Inc.. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount of $ 350.00 is Exempt. (Brown, Michael)
Related: [-]