Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-11675
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2022
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 11, 2023 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
TODD LAWRENCE HARVISON
Represented By
ADAM BRYAN WOLFSON
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Etc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 05, 2023
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/10 10:44 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed only on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case by June 5, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/5/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/12 1:29 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7380904.), filed by TODD LAWRENCE HARVISON. (WOLFSON, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet