Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-11752
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 11, 2023 5:11 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
DAVID EDWIN CULPEPPER
Represented By
ADAM BRYAN WOLFSON
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Etc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 25, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 05/25 2:56 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT for DAVID EDWIN CULPEPPER. Attorney ADAM BRYAN WOLFSON terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/25/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 05/25 10:22 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by DAVID EDWIN CULPEPPER. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 05/25 1:17 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:2 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/12 6:44 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7381152.), filed by DAVID EDWIN CULPEPPER. (WOLFSON, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet