Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-12321
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2023 7:33 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
ISAI MORENO
Represented By
ADAM BRYAN WOLFSON
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Etc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 08/24 4:04 PM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number FLN300015589. Fee status updated to paid. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/12 9:05 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by ISAI MORENO. (WOLFSON, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet