Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Chad F Kenney
Referred: Jose R Arteaga
Case #: 2:22-cv-03195
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2022
Re-opened:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:Nov 30, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
35 35 respoth Response Wed 05/07 12:44 PM
Response re32 Order, by THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA. (NAPIORSKI, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 misc Pretrial Memorandum Mon 04/21 1:40 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by VINCENT HARRIS Certificate of Service. (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID NAPIORSKI on behalf of THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA with WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF SHOSHANA SILVERSTEIN; Certificate of Service(NAPIORSKI, DAVID)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/08 9:17 AM
ORDER THAT, ON OR BEFORE TUESDAY, 5/6/25, THE PARTIES SHALL EACH FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, NOT TO EXCEED 10 DOUBLE-SPACED PAGES IN LENGTH, ADDRESSING MOSES' IMPLICATIONS FOR HARRIS' ARGUMENT THAT POSTCONVICTION COUNSEL'S ADANDONMENT EXCUSES DEFAULT OF HIS UNEXHAUSTED CLAIMS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSE R. ARTEAGA ON 4/8/25. 4/8/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/23 3:00 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED REFERRAL JUDGE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET TO THE CALENDAR OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSE R. ARTEAGA FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/23/24. 5/23/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
30 30 misc State Court Record - Attachment Tue 01/09 10:13 AM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County.(CCP - Philadelphia County cr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Secured,
Att: 3 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 4 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 5 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 6 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 7 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 8 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 9 Notes of Testimony,
Att: 10 Notes of Testimony
Thursday, December 07, 2023
29 29 respoth Response Thu 12/07 3:55 PM
Response Petitioner's Reply to Commonwealth Response by VINCENT HARRIS. (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/30 2:20 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/30/23. 11/30/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/17 2:34 PM
ORDER THAT PETITIONER'S26 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A REPLY TO COMMONWEALTH'S RESPONSE26 IS GRANTED. PETITIONER MAY FILE HIS REPLY WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE HE RECEIVES THE RELEVANT RECORDINGS FROM THE COMMONWEALTH. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 10/17/23.10/17/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 14, 2023
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Sat 10/14 11:27 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Commonwealth Response filed by VINCENT HARRIS.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to RICHARD A. LLORET.(SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Response to Habeas Petition Thu 10/12 7:06 PM
ANSWER to Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus , RESPONSE to12 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.(SILVERSTEIN, SHOSHANA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/13 12:08 PM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENTS' FOURTH23 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS GRANTED. RESPONDENTS HAVE THE REQUESTED ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS TO RESPOND. THE RESPONSE TO THE PETITION IS NOW DUE ON 10/12/23. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 9/13/23.9/13/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/12 6:28 PM
Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to RICHARD A. LLORET.(SILVERSTEIN, SHOSHANA)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/24 1:09 PM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENTS' THIRD UNOPPOSED21 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE IS GRANTED. RESPONDENT HAS THE REQUESTED 60 ADDITIONAL DAYS TO RESPOND. THE REPSONSE IS NOW DUE ON 9/12/23.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 7/24/23.7/24/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 07/14 6:32 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to RICHARD A. LLORET.(SILVERSTEIN, SHOSHANA)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/19 10:17 AM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENT'S SECOND UNOPPOSED19 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE IS GRANTED. RESPONDENT HAS THE REQUESTED ADDITIONAL 60 DAYS TO RESPOND. THE RESPONSE IS NOW DUE JULY 14, 2023.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 5/19/23.5/19/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/15 5:05 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to RICHARD A. LLORET.(SILVERSTEIN, SHOSHANA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Thu 02/16 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW C. STIEGLER on behalf of THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA(STIEGLER, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/15 2:54 PM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENT'S16 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE IS GRANTED. RESPONDENT HAS REQUESTED AN ADDITIONAL 90 DAYS TO RESPOND. THE RESPONSE IS NOW DUE ON 5/15/23.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 2/14/23.2/15/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/13 4:54 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to RICHARD A. LLORET.(SILVERSTEIN, SHOSHANA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/07 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHOSHANA D. SILVERSTEIN on behalf of THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(SILVERSTEIN, SHOSHANA)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 07, 2023
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Sat 01/07 6:48 AM
NOTICE by VINCENT HARRIS Notice of Filing Exhibit (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
13 13 trial Exhibit Thu 12/29 6:01 AM
EXHIBIT Petititoner's Appendix of Exhibits by VINCENT HARRIS.. Certificate of Service (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 12/29 5:59 AM
Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Supporting Memorandum of Law against THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA. (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/16 12:21 PM
ORDER THAT PETITIONER VINCENT HARRIS'S UNOPPOSED RULE 15 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND OR CORRECT THE HABEAS PETITION10 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 11/16/22. 11/16/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Wed 11/16 5:39 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Habeas Petition filed by VINCENT HARRIS.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to RICHARD A. LLORET.(SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
misc Returned Mail Wed 10/19 8:20 AM
Copy of Order/Notice dated 8/12/22 (Document # 4, Pro Se Guidelines) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Vincent Harris for the following reason: Failed authentication, no control number. Plaintiff now has counsel. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/05 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW C. STIEGLER on behalf of THOMAS MCGINLEY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(STIEGLER, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order for Prisoner State Record Wed 10/05 10:54 AM
ORDER THAT THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL ENTER THEIR APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF THE RESPONDENTS UPON RECEIPT OF THIS ORDER. PETITIONER SHALL FILE A SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW WITHIN 90 DAYS OF THIS ORDER. THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORENY'S OFFICE SHALL FILE A SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWER TO THE CLAIMS IN MR. HARRIS' HABEAS PETITION AND SUPPORTING LEGAL MEMORANDUM WITHIN 45 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF PETITIONER'S SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM IS FILED. ALL OPINIONS OF THE COMMONWEALTH COURTS WILL BE ATTACHED AS EXHIBITS TO THE MEMORANDUM. IF PETITIONER FILES ANY NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL RESPOND WITHIN 14 DAYS PER LRCP 7.1(C) AND FRCP 81(A)(4)(A). THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE NEED NOT FILE A RESPONSE IF THE COURT RULES ON PETITIONER'S MOTION BEFORE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE HAS FILED ITS RESPONSE. THE CLERK FOR THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. HARRIS, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA,CP-51-CR-0006880-2013 WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 10/5/22. 10/5/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED. THIS ORDER, PETITION1 , AND DOCKET REPORT FAXED TO CCP PHILA., PA ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE AND PHILA. D.A.'S OFFICE. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
7 7 motion Leave to File Document Tue 10/04 6:13 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by VINCENT HARRIS.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to RICHARD A. LLORET.(SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/04 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ALAN SILVERMAN on behalf of VINCENT HARRIS with Certificate of Service(SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/01 1:34 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD A. LLORET, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/1/22. 9/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETITIONER.(er)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Thu 09/01 1:40 PM
Petition and Order (doc.5) e-mailed to Attorney General of PA and DA of Philadelphia. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
4 4 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Fri 08/12 11:45 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (fdc)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Fri 08/12 1:18 PM
Mailed copy of #4 Pro se guidelines to Vincent Harris. (afm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
3 3 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY) Fri 08/12 11:05 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by VINCENT HARRIS.(fdc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 08/12 11:03 AM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 20001105 SCI COAL TOWNSHIP (fdc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 08/12 11:01 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 20001105.), filed by VINCENT HARRIS.(fdc)
Related: [-]