District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00241
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 13, 2022 3:48 AM EDT
Defendant
JONATHAN WILLIS (1)
Represented By
James Neil Papirmeister
Law Offices Of James N. Papimeister P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Caroline Burrell
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/13/2022 4:44 AM EDT
Friday, May 27, 2022
1 1 1 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1). (zltp) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS.(zltp) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 5/27/2022. (zltp) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
Arrest of JONATHAN WILLIS (1) (bb) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1). (bb) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JONATHAN WILLIS (1). (bb) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Temporary Detention by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1). (bb) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: In Person Return on Arrest Warrant / Initial Appearance as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1) held on 6/9/2022. Defendant was present by video. Oral Motion by the Government to Unseal Case as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1); Heard and Granted. Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel for today's hearing only by JONATHAN WILLIS (1); Heard and Granted. Oral Motion by the Government for Temporary Detention as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1); Heard and Granted. Detention Hearing set for 6/22/2022 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 4- In Person before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant held without bond; Court Reporter: FTR Gold; FTR Time Frame: CTRM 4 [4:41:53-4:45:53] [5:16:37-5:34:42]; Defense Attorney: Elizabeth Mullin; U.S. Attorney: Caroline Burrell; Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman. (bb) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1): As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 6/9/2022. (bb) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1) (bb) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Arrest Warrant, dated 5/27/2022, Returned Executed in Washington, D.C on 6/9/2022 as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1). (bb) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Neil Papirmeister appearing for JONATHAN WILLIS (Papirmeister, James) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
7 7 18 pgs MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PRETRIAL RELEASE by JONATHAN WILLIS.(Papirmeister, James) Modified text on 6/21/2022 (zstd). [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit LETTER FROM DR. RONALD I. WEINER, Ph.D.,
Att: 2 Exhibit WORK HISTORY & DOCUMENTATION,
Att: 3 Exhibit PERSONAL BACKGROUND & FAMILY HISTORY,
Att: 4 Exhibit CHARACTER REFERENCES,
Att: 5 Exhibit APARTMENT LEASE & PHOTOS
8 8 17 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Pretrial Detention by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS (Burrell, Caroline) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: Case called for Detention hearing on 6/22/2022 for JONATHAN WILLIS (1) but not held. Defendant not present for reasons set forth on the record. Detention Hearing continued to 6/23/2022 at 3:30 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant remains held without bond; Court Reporter: FTR GOLD; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [2:46:30 - 2:54:01];Defense Attorney: James Papirmeister; US Attorney: Caroline Burrell. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
ORAL MOTION for Release from Custody by JONATHAN WILLIS. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: Detention Hearing as to JONATHAN WILLIS held but did not conclude on 6/23/2022. Defendant present by telephone. Oral motion by the Government to commit the defendant to the custody of the Attorney General; heard. Oral Motion by JONATHAN WILLIS for release from custody; heard. Continued Detention Hearing set for 6/29/2022 at 2:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains held without bond; Court Reporter: FTR GOLD; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [3:58:48 - 5:52:58]; Defense Attorney: James Papirmeister; US Attorney: Caroline Burrell; Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
9 9 Supplement by JONATHAN WILLIS re7 Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Release(Papirmeister, James) Modified to add link and text on 6/23/2022 (zstd). [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order of Detention in U.S. v Glover, No. 21-mj-609,
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter Regarding Sherry Willis,
Att: 3 Exhibit Discharge of Willis Home Mortgage,
Att: 4 Exhibit CV of Dr. Ronald I. Weiner, Ph.D.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Information about Clinical & Forensic Associates
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
10 10 Consent MOTION for Protective Order re Discovery by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS. (Burrell, Caroline) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
ORAL MOTION to Stay of Release by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: Continued Detention Hearing as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1) held on 6/29/2022. Defendant present by video. Oral Motion by the Government to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1); heard and denied. Oral Motion for Release from Custody by JONATHAN WILLIS (1); heard and granted. The Court orders the Defendants release to the High Intensity Supervision Program/Home Incarceration/3rd Party Custodian(s). Oral Motion by the Government to Stay the Release as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1); heard and granted. The release of the Defendant shall be stayed until 7/4/2022 at 9 AM for the Government to appeal the release decision to Chief Judge Howell. The Defendant waives the right to a preliminary hearing within 14 days. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/20/2022 at 2:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR GOLD; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [2:12:07 - 3:01:08]; Defense Attorney: James Papirmeister; US Attorney: Caroline Burrell; Prob Officer: Tonika Cooper (Michigan); Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to JONATHAN WILLIS. On June 29, 2022, the parties appeared before the Court for a Continued Detention Hearing. The Court found that notwithstanding the serious allegations against Defendant outlined in the Complaint (ECF No.1 ), conditions of release could be fashioned to reasonably assure the safety of the community and Defendants appearance as required. As such, the Court ordered that Defendant be released into home incarceration at his proposed third-party custodians residence in the Western District of Michigan, under the courtesy supervision of the Pretrial Services Agency for the Western District of Michigan. Defendant would be monitored at this residence by his proposed third party custodians, his mother and his father. See Proposed Release Conditions12 . The Court inquired upon Defendants proposed custodians and found them able to monitor Defendant effectively. The custodians understood that if appointed, they would need to ensure that Defendant would be in compliance with all conditions of his release. See id. These conditions of release are consistent with 21-mj-005, 19-cr-350, 20-cr-083, and 21-cr-102, where defendants charged with similar violations have been successfully supervised. Moreover, the Western District of Michigan Pre-Trial Services Officer testified that unlike in United States v. Glover, 21-mj-00609, Pre-Trial Services is able to conduct home visits in this case.At the conclusion of the hearing, counsel for the government orally moved for a temporary stay of the Courts release order. The Court granted the motion and stayed Defendants release until the matter is presented to Chief Judge Howell. The government shall file their points of authorities in support of their appeal by July 4, 2022 at 9:00 AM. Defense counsel shall coordinate with the Chambers of Chief Judge Howell regarding the filing of any reply. The governments appeal transfers this matter to the purview of Chief Judge Howell, who will preside over the governments Motion for Stay and for Review of Release Order and any other requested relief, including a further stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 6/29/2022. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
11 11 SUPPLEMENT by JONATHAN WILLIS re7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PRETRIAL RELEASE [SECOND SUPPLEMENT](Papirmeister, James) Modified to add link on 6/29/2022 (zstd). [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email from Lorie A. Hodel of US Probation Offc in Michigan,
Att: 2 Exhibit Supplemental Letter from Dr. Ronald I Weiner, Ph.D.,
Att: 3 Exhibit USA v DANIEL JOHNSTON Case,
Att: 4 Exhibit USA v MATTHEW SHARP Case,
Att: 5 Exhibit USA v GARY PEKSA Case,
Att: 6 Exhibit USA v MICHAEL ROBERSON Case
12 12 PROPOSED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1) HISP/Home Incarceration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 06/29/2022. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), as to JONATHAN WILLIS, DIRECTING that (1) defendant submit by noon on July 5, 2022, any opposition to the government's13 Motion for Review of Release Order and (2) the government submit any reply in support of its motion by noon on July 6, 2022; and FURTHER DIRECTING the parties to appear for a Motion Hearing on the government's13 Motion for Review of Release Order at 9:45 AM on July 8, 2022, IN PERSON before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 1, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
13 13 Emergency MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Review Release Order by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS. (Burrell, Caroline) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs ORDER as to JONATHAN WILLIS, STAYING, upon consideration of the Government's13 Motion for Emergency Stay and for Review of Release Order, the Release Order entered by the presiding magistrate judge on June 29, 2022, pending review of the detention decision by this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 1, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
15 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1). The parties attention is directed to the edits that the Court has made to paragraph 12 of the Proposed Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 07/01/2022. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to JONATHAN WILLIS: Defendant's response to the government's13 Motion for Review of Release Order due by noon on 7/5/2022; government's reply due by noon on 7/6/2022; Motion Hearing scheduled for 7/8/2022, at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 22A- In Person before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (ztg) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
16 16 30+ pgs Memorandum in Opposition by JONATHAN WILLIS re13 Emergency MOTION to Stay MOTION to Review Release Order & Motion for Pretrial Release from Custody(Papirmeister, James) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1A- PROPOSAL FOR PSYCHOSEXUAL EVALUTION & RISK ASSESSMENT,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1B- OPTIONS FOR CONDUCTING PSYCHOSEXUAL EVALUATION & RISK ASSESSMENT,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1C- CV OF DR. RONALD I WEINER, Ph.D.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1D- INFORMATION ABOUT CLINICAL & FORENSIC ASSOCIATES,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1E- EMAIL FROM LORIE A HODEL,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2- WORK HISTORY,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3- PERSONAL BACKGROUND & FAMILY HISTORY,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3A- DISCHARGE OF HOME MORTGAGE,
Att: 9 Exhibit 3B- SHERRY WILLIS EMPLOYMENT & CHARACTER REFERENCE,
Att: 10 Exhibit 4- CHARACTER REFERENCES,
Att: 11 Exhibit 5- APARTMENT LEASE & PHOTOS,
Att: 12 Exhibit 6- USA v RAYMOND GLOVER Case,
Att: 13 Exhibit 7- USA v DANIEL JOHNSTON Case,
Att: 14 Exhibit 8- USA v MATTHEW SHARP Case,
Att: 15 Exhibit 9- USA v GARY PEKSA Case,
Att: 16 Exhibit 10- USA v MICHAEL ROBERSON Case
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
17 17 REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by USA as to JONATHAN WILLIS re13 Emergency MOTION to Stay MOTION to Review Release Order (Burrell, Caroline) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell:Motion Hearing as to JONATHAN WILLIS held on 7/8/2022 regarding Government's13 MOTION to Review of Release Order. Government's motion for pretrial detention, heard and DENIED; Magistrate's Release Order AFFIRMED. Defendant released to the custody of third party custodians and the courtesy supervision of the Pretrial Services for the Western District of Michigan. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant released to Home Incarceration/release issued. Present: Defense Attorney: James N. Papirmester; US Attorney: Caroline Burrell; Pretrial Officer: Christine Schuck; Witnesses: Sherry Denise Willis and James L. Willis. Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth. (ztg) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) as to JONATHAN WILLIS, GRANTING approval for delay of the installation of location monitoring equipment on defendant JONATHAN WILLIS until as soon as practicable Monday, July 11, 2022; and DIRECTING defendant to make contact with U.S. Cooper (616-456-2370) and leave a voicemail upon his arrival in the Western District of Michigan to await further instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 8, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
18 18 6 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JONATHAN WILLIS. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 7/8/2022. (ztg) [1:22-mj-00122-RMM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Appearance Bond
Thursday, July 14, 2022
19 19 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to JONATHAN WILLIS (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zltp)
Related: [-]