New York Southern District Court
Judge:Arun Subramanian
Referred: James L Cott
Case #: 1:22-cv-06915
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2022
Re-opened:May 17, 2024
Terminated:Jul 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 11, 2023 12:43 PM EST
Defendant
Lenox Coffee LLC
Defendant
Monica Prado
Defendant
Rosa Prado
Defendant
Arturo Viramontes
Plaintiff
Margarito Basurto
Represented By
Ramsha Ansari
Csm Legal P.C.
contact info
Catalina Sojo
Csm Legal P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 15, 2024
69 69 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/15 2:23 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Arturo Viramontes pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.The parties have certified that there is no settlement between plaintiff and Arturo Viramontes. Dkt. 63. As such, the Court will accept this stipulation of dismissal. See Bailes v. Halo Media, LL C, 2023 WL 5606139, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Aug. 30, 2023) ("[T]he Court will accept a stipulation of dismissal under Rule 4l (a)(l )(A), so long as (1) the parties' stipulation of dismissal dismisses claims arising under the FLSA without prejudice and (2) the parties certify that there has been no settlement of FLSA claims."). The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 7/15/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
68 68 misc Letter Mon 07/15 9:27 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Amy Gina Kim dated 07/15/2024 re: Stipulated Dismissal of Defendant Arturo Viramontes. Document filed by Margarito Basurto(individually), Margarito Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Kim, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
67 67 1 pgs order Order Thu 07/11 12:56 PM
ORDER: On July 1, 2024, the Court entered the parties' proposed judgment. However, the proposed judgment did not mention or enter judgment against defendant Arturo Viramontes. If that was a mistake, the parties should file an amended proposed judgment by July 17, 2024, and the Court will vacate the previous judgment. If that was not a mistake and plaintiffs intend to proceed against defendant Viramontes, they should file a letter by July 17, 2024, indicating the next steps for this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 7/11/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]