Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-16475
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Feb 16, 2023 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
KURT BRIAN HOLDEN
Represented By
ADAM BRYAN WOLFSON
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Etc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 04, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Fri 05/05 4:02 PM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by May 18, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/4/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 09/08 4:59 PM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number FLN400044949. Fee status updated to paid. (erl)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 14, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by KURT BRIAN HOLDEN. (WOLFSON, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet