Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-16541
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2022
Last checked: Monday Feb 13, 2023 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER R BARTIN
Represented By
NICOLE CORINNE BERG
Keller Postman Llc - Chicago Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Wed 08/31 11:09 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Note to Filer for future reference: When entering party names please add the full name as it is on the Complaint, i.e. middle name, middle initials, generation. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Wed 08/17 12:45 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File (not 1 Original Proceeding). The code has been added to the civil cover sheet, (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17) Clerk will correct origin code and reassign judges. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 08/16 8:09 AM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - MINNESOTA by CHRISTOPHER R BARTIN (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/16 8:07 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/16 7:59 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7399312.), filed by CHRISTOPHER R BARTIN. (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]