Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:22-cv-01148
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:688 Jones Act
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2022
Terminated:Feb 16, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 12, 2023 5:10 AM PST
Defendant
Alaska Boat Company
Represented By
Louis A Shields
Legros Buchanan & Paul (wa)
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Lee LLC
Represented By
Louis A Shields
Legros Buchanan & Paul (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Dean Gribble, Sr
Represented By
James Patrick Jacobsen
Stacey & Jacobsen LLP
contact info
Joseph Stephen Stacey
Stacey & Jacobsen LLP
contact info
Nigel Stacey
Stacey & Jacobsen LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 16, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/16 9:18 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. The trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/07 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Of All Claims Against All Parties by Defendants Alaska Boat Company, Patricia Lee LLC (Shields, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
16 16 order RAJ Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates Tue 11/08 8:04 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 4 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 9/25/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 11/15/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/29/2023, Discovery completed by 5/30/2023, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 6/27/2023, Motions in Limine due by 8/28/2023, Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2023, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 9/18/2023. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
15 15 misc Joint Status Report Mon 11/07 3:49 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. (Stacey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
14 14 order RAJ Joint Status Report Order (FORM) Tue 10/11 9:53 AM
ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/25/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/1/2022, Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc RAJ Standing Order Tue 10/11 9:50 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 10/07 2:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent Letter & Form Fri 10/07 12:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/14/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/07 11:22 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Alaska Boat Company, Patricia Lee LLC.(Shields, Louis)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/07 11:21 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaska Boat Company, Patricia Lee LLC (Shields, Louis)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/07 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Louis A Shields on behalf of Defendants Alaska Boat Company, Patricia Lee LLC. (Shields, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 09/21 1:22 PM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to All Defendants - Alaska Boat Company(AQ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Patricia Lee LLC
Monday, September 19, 2022
6 6 misc Praecipe for a Summons Mon 09/19 2:52 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Dean Gribble, Sr(Stacey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/17 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nigel Stacey on behalf of Plaintiff Dean Gribble, Sr. (Stacey, Nigel)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/17 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Patrick Jacobsen on behalf of Plaintiff Dean Gribble, Sr. (Jacobsen, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 08/17 10:23 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s). See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Ad Hoc Attorneys James P. Jacobsen and Nigel T. Stacey) (JWC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/17 10:21 AM
Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (JWC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/16 10:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Dean Gribble, Sr. (Stacey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/16 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Joseph Stephen Stacey added to party Dean Gribble, Sr(pty:pla), filed by Dean Gribble, Sr.(Stacey, Joseph) (No Fee Required)
Related: [-]