Colorado District Court
Judge:Michael E Hegarty
Case #: 1:22-cv-02090
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2022
Terminated:Jan 04, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 12, 2023 1:46 AM MST
Defendant
American Emergency Response & Recovery Company, LLC
Represented By
Avi Noam Wagner
The Wagner Firm
contact info
Defendant
India Cardomone
Represented By
Daniel E. Becnel, III
Becnel Law Firm
contact info
Kathryn W. Becnel
Becnel Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Jack Jungquist
Represented By
Keith Richard Scranton
Springer & Steinberg, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
William Laing
Represented By
Amy Elizabeth Ferrin
Daniel J. Caplis Law Firm LLC
contact info
Defendant
Louise Lipsey
Defendant
Joseph Lipsey III
Defendant
Joseph Lipsey IV
Defendant
Lillian Royer
Represented By
Lance Michael Sears
Sears & Associates P.C.
contact info
Hollie Lynn Wieland
Sears & Associates P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Shira Lipsey
Represented By
Avi Noam Wagner
The Wagner Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Foremost Signature Insurance Company
Represented By
Elaine Katherine Stafford
Lambdin & Chaney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/04 4:11 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 January 2023. The parties' Motion for Order of Dismissal without Prejudice (ECF28 ) is granted. Pursuant to the terms of their agreement, this federal civil action is dismissed without prejudice to the ability to refile it in the state district court for Pitkin County, Colorado. The Scheduling Conference currently set for January 26, 2023 is vacated. . The Clerk of Court shall close this case. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Wed 01/04 12:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case without Prejudice by Plaintiff Foremost Signature Insurance Company. (Stafford, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 12/22 5:15 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS AMERICAN EMERGENCY RESPONSE & RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC AND SHIRA LIPSEY TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [CM/ECF Dkt. No. 1] UP TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 6, 2023 by Defendants American Emergency Response & Recovery Company, LLC, Shira Lipsey. (Wagner, Avi)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 12/22 11:29 AM
ORDER granting26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for American Emergency Response and Recovery Co., LLC and Shira Lipsey to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/6/2023. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/22/2022. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 12/14 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn W. Becnel on behalf of India Cardomone (Becnel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/14 3:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, Attorney Kathryn W. Becnel added to party India Cardomone(pty:dft) by India Cardomone.(Becnel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
22 22 3 pgs order Order Thu 11/10 9:17 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10 November 2022. For good cause shown, Defendant William Laing's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time20 and Defendant Lillian Royer's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time21 are granted. The deadline for Defendants William Laing and Lillian Royer to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to December 23, 2022. The Court sua sponte resets the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference from its current date of December 6, 2022 to January 26, 2023 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 3-9) on or before January 18, 2023. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 11/10 4:40 PM
ORDER terminating20 Motion for Extension of Time and21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in light of the Court's Order at ECF 22 granting them. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/10/2022. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 11/09 4:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT LILLIAN ROYER TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [CM/ECF Dkt. No. 1] UP TO AND INCLUDING DECEMBER 23, 2022 by Defendant Lillian Royer.(Wieland, Hollie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 11/09 3:05 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint,,,, by Defendant William Laing.(Ferrin, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order
19 19 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 11/09 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Entry of Appearance for Defendant Lillian Royer by Hollie L. Wieland by Hollie Lynn Wieland on behalf of Lillian RoyerAttorney Hollie Lynn Wieland added to party Lillian Royer(pty:dft) (Wieland, Hollie)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 11/09 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Entry of Appearance for Defendant Lillian Royer by Lance M. Sears by Lance Michael Sears on behalf of Lillian RoyerAttorney Lance Michael Sears added to party Lillian Royer(pty:dft) (Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/31 3:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, for Declaratory Judgment filed by Jack Jungquist.(Scranton, Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 10/27 11:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint,,,, by Defendant William Laing.(Ferrin, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 10/27 1:14 PM
ORDER granting15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for Defendant William Laing to Answer or Otherwise Respond to1 Complaint is extended to 11/14/2022. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/27/2022. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
14 14 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 10/26 10:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shira Lipsey, American Emergency Response & Recovery Company, LLC. Shira Lipsey waiver sent on 10/26/2022, answer due 12/25/2022; American Emergency Response & Recovery Company, LLC waiver sent on 10/26/2022, answer due 12/25/2022. (Wagner, Avi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Case Association Tue 10/25 5:16 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Avi Noam Wagner on behalf of American Emergency Response & Recovery Company, LLC, Shira Lipsey (Wagner, Avi)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 10/25 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Avi Noam Wagner on behalf of American Emergency Response & Recovery Company, LLC, Shira LipseyAttorney Avi Noam Wagner added to party American Emergency Response & Recovery Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Noam Wagner added to party Shira Lipsey(pty:dft) (Wagner, Avi)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
11 11 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 10/17 9:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company. Lillian Royer waiver sent on 9/15/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Stafford, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
10 10 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Fri 10/14 3:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Laing. William Laing served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Ferrin, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 10/11 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Amy Ferrin by Amy Elizabeth Ferrin on behalf of William LaingAttorney Amy Elizabeth Ferrin added to party William Laing(pty:dft) (Ferrin, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
8 8 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 09/22 2:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company. Jack Jungquist waiver sent on 8/31/2022, answer due 10/30/2022. (Stafford, Elaine)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 09/22 2:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company. Lillian Royer served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022. (Stafford, Elaine)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 09/22 2:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company. India Cardomone served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022. (Stafford, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 09/16 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Keith Richard Scranton on behalf of Jack JungquistAttorney Keith Richard Scranton added to party Jack Jungquist(pty:dft) (Scranton, Keith)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/02 11:20 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 September 2022. Consent Form due by 11/29/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/29/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2022 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
3 3 misc Summons Issued Wed 08/17 9:17 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/16 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against American Emergency Response & Recovery Company, LLC, India Cardomone, Jack Jungquist, William Laing, Louise Lipsey, Joseph Lipsey III, Joseph Lipsey IV, Shira Lipsey aka Ilana Spector, Lillian Royer (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8609367)Attorney Elaine Katherine Stafford added to party Foremost Signature Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company.(Stafford, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 17 Summons American Emergency,
Att: 18 Summons Cardomone, India,
Att: 19 Summons Jungquist, Jack,
Att: 20 Summons Laing, William,
Att: 21 Summons Lipsey III, Joseph,
Att: 22 Summons Lipsey IV, Joseph,
Att: 23 Summons Lipsey, Louise,
Att: 24 Summons Lipsey, Shira,
Att: 25 Summons Royer, Lilliane
misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 08/17 8:30 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
Related: [-]