California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:22-cv-05807
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2022
Terminated:Feb 06, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV22548
Last checked: Sunday Feb 12, 2023 6:03 AM PST
Defendant
Ronald Bloomingkemper
Represented By
Paul J Riehle
Faegre Drinker Biddle And Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Freedom Equity Group Inc.
Represented By
Paul J Riehle
Faegre Drinker Biddle And Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Freedom Equity Group, LLC
Represented By
Andrew Stewart Ayala
Faegre Drinker Biddle And Reath LLP
contact info
Paul J Riehle
Faegre Drinker Biddle And Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Petrinowich
Represented By
Paul J Riehle
Faegre Drinker Biddle And Reath LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
David Bolstad
Represented By
David Charles Bolstad
Safarian Choi And Bolstad LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Insigne Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Mazda
Law Office Of Mark Mazda
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 11/01/2022


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
44 44 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 08/22 12:05 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re Judgment33 filed by Defendants Ronald Bloomingkemper, Freedom Equity Group Inc., Freedom Equity Group, LLC, Ronald Petrinowich. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
43 43 order Leave For In Camera Review Attorney Fees Wed 05/03 9:41 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC'S Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Costs (DKT.37 ) and DENYING AS MOOT Motion to Submit Detailed Unredacted Billing (DKT.36 ) and ORDERS that Insigne Consulting, Inc., pay for all attorneys fees and costs incurred by Freedom Equity Group, LLC in this litigation in the amount totaling $280,360.72. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
42 42 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/02 3:46 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion37 set for May 8, 2023 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
41 41 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/24 6:43 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 37 filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
40 40 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Tue 04/04 11:43 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer on Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Expenses and Costs39 is rescheduled to 5/8/2023. See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
39 39 respm Motion Related Document Mon 04/03 5:33 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT FREEDOM EQUITY GROUP, LLC'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES AND COSTS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 37 filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
38 38 respm Exhibit to Motion Wed 03/22 11:55 AM
EXHIBIT 2 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 37 filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
37 37 motion Attorney Fees Tue 03/21 10:35 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Paul J. Riehle,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Email to Mazda 022123,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Email to Mazda 030723,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - SOS LLC,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - SOS Articles and State of Information,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - Riehle Profile,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - Ayala Profile,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - Leaf Profile,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 - Kise Profile,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 - R. Pearl Declaration,
Att: 12 Proposed Order
36 36 motion Leave For In Camera Review Tue 03/21 9:38 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave for In Camera Review filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC.(Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
35 35 order Continue Tue 02/21 8:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING FREEDOM EQUITY GROUP, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES34 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 18, 2023
34 34 motion Continue Sat 02/18 6:57 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees from February 21, 2023 to March 21, 2023 filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, February 06, 2023
33 33 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 02/06 4:39 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer that Plaintiff take nothing, the action be dismissed with prejudice, and Defendants recover costs of suit pursuant to a bill of costs filed in accordance with 28 USC section 1920. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
32 32 motion Judgment as a Matter of Law Fri 02/03 12:35 PM
REQUEST for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
31 31 order Strike Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 01/12 9:53 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.21 ) and GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Strike Sur Reply Declaration of Michael Jones (Dkt.30 ). An amended complaint may be filed and served no later than 1/31/2023. See Order for specifics. (jp) Modified on 1/12/2023 (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
30 30 motion Strike Fri 01/06 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Sur Reply Declaration of Michael Jones in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Declaration (Motion related),29 filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
29 29 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 01/03 6:40 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Jones in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 21 (Sur Reply Declaration) filed by Plaintiff Insigne Consulting, Inc..(Mazda, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Sur Reply Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Sur Reply Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Sur Reply Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Sur Reply Declaration of Michael Jones
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 01/03 10:37 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion21 set for Monday, January 9, 2023 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
27 27 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Tue 12/20 9:35 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) David Bolstad has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
26 26 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 12/19 3:13 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 21 filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/06 2:04 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 21 filed by Plaintiff Insigne Consulting, Inc..(Mazda, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Michael Jones,
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Michael Jones
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Wed 11/23 9:49 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer ADOPTING Stipulation on Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing23 . The hearing date for the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing21 is RESCHEDULED to 1/9/2023. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
23 23 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 11/22 6:45 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1/30/23 re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 21 filed by Defendants Ronald Bloomingkemper, Freedom Equity Group Inc., Freedom Equity Group, LLC, Ronald Petrinowich.(Attorney Paul J Riehle added to party Ronald Bloomingkemper(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Riehle added to party Freedom Equity Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Riehle added to party Ronald Petrinowich(pty:dft))(Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Adopting Stipulation On Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date On Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLCs Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Standing
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
22 22 misc Errata Wed 11/16 11:48 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 21 Resubmitting Declaration of Paul J. Riehle with Separate docketed Exhibits(Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Paul J. Riehle,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Insigne's Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Copy of Transcript from the Scheduling Conference,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Email Exchange Re Contract,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Indiana SOS Certificate of Incorporation,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Indiana SOS Articles of Dissolution,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - N. Carolina SOS Articles of Inc. - Insigne 1,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - N. Carolina SOS Articles of Dissolution,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - N. Carolina SOS Articles of Inc. - Insigne 2
21 21 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 11/16 9:07 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Paul J. Riehle,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
20 20 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Wed 11/02 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings October 31, 2022 at 11:20 a.m. re Transcript19 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia)
Related: [-]
19 19 transcript -Transcript Wed 11/02 1:11 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on October 31, 2022 at 11:20 a.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2023. (Cuneo, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
18 18 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Tue 11/01 9:38 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/12/23. (rfi)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 11/01 8:39 AM
Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 11/01 8:34 AM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court establishes the case management dates as stated on the record. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (rfi)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
15 15 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Mon 10/31 5:20 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Willie Ackart at willie.ackart@faegredrinker.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 10/24 10:02 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC.. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
13 13 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Wed 10/12 12:17 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Document No.12 was not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with a flattened version. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/12 4:01 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Dates, as well as Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion to Remand10 . The Scheduling Conference is continued to 10/31/2022 at 11:00 AM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 09/06 10:06 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Stewart Ayala counsel for Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. Adding Andrew S. Ayala as counsel of record for Freedom Equity Group, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Attorney Andrew Stewart Ayala added to party Freedom Equity Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Ayala, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
10 10 stip Continue Fri 09/02 3:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 09/26/2022 to 10/31/2022 filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC.(Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 08/30 4:16 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pk)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 08/30 4:16 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 08/17 7:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC, of Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer served on August 17, 2022. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 08/17 3:00 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 08/17 2:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 08/17 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/16 4:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC identifying No parent corporation as Corporate Parent. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 08/16 4:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/16 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV22548 Receipt No: ACACDC-33821913 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. (Attorney Paul J Riehle added to party Freedom Equity Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Riehle, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Answer to Complaint in State Court Action
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 08/17 2:51 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Ronald Bloomingkemper, Does, Freedom Equity Group Inc., Freedom Equity Group, LLC, Ronald Petrinowich. Jury Demanded., filed by Defendant Insigne Consulting, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 07/12/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/17 2:53 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to COMPLAINT. JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Freedom Equity Group, LLC. [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]