Member Case
Lead case is: 7:22-bk-22549

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James L Garrity Jr
Case #: 7:22-bk-22608
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Branded Operations Holdings, Inc.
1400 Atwater Drive
Malvern, PA 19355
Represented By
Catherine V. LoTempio
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Frank A. Oswald
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Brian P Maloney
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Kyle J. Ortiz
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 1:26 PM EST
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Claims Agent
(Formerly Prime Clerk LLC) 1 World Trade Center 31st Floor www.kroll.com
New York, NY 10007
Creditor
Charles Anderson
1205 California Ave #2
Las Cruces, NM 88001
Creditor
Dolores Talotta
766 Darby Crescent Road
Prospect Park, PA 19076
Interested Party
ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael Steven Shuster
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael Steven Shuster
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael Steven Shuster
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Patrick J. Bartels, Jr., Plan Administrator for the Remaining Debtors
Represented By
Brian P Maloney
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Trustee of the ENDO Ranitidine Trust
ROBINSON & COLE LLP 1201 N. Market Street, Suite 1406
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Natalie D. Ramsey
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004

GPO Mar 30 2025
Memorandum Decision signed on 3/30/2025 Denying Motion for Entry of an Order Modifying The Plan of Reorganization. (related document(s)56) (Rodriguez, Willie)
GPO Apr 17 2025
Memorandum Decision signed on 4/16/2025 Sustaining Plan Administrators Fourth Omnibus Objection to Certain (I) Amended Claims; (II) Modified Amount And Priority Claims; (III) No Liability Claims; (IV) DMP Claims; And (V) Claims To Be Reclassified. (related document(s)62) (Rodriguez, Willie)

Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
118 118 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/15 2:46 PM
Affidavit of Service of Alain B. Francoeur Regarding Plan Administrators Objection to Motion for Reconsideration Related [+] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Claims Agent.(Malo, David)
Related: [-] 113
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
117 117 ans Statement Wed 05/14 11:37 AM
Statement /Supplement to Response Related [+] filed by Charles Anderson. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 116
Att: 1 Exhibit
115 115 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Tue 05/13 4:08 PM
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving The Plan Administrators (A) Second Omnibus Objection to Certain (I) Substantive Duplicate Claims, (II) Cross Debtor Duplicate Claims, and (III) No Liability Claims and (B) Third Omnibus Objection to Certain (I) Satisfied Claims, (II) Modified Priority Claims, (III) Modified Amount Claims, and (IV) Modified Priority and Amount Claims as it Relates to the Claims of Strides Pharma, Inc. and its Affiliates filed by Brian P Maloney on behalf of Patrick J. Bartels, Jr., Plan Administrator for the Remaining Debtors. (Maloney, Brian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 11, 2025
116 116 ans Response Wed 05/14 11:13 AM
Response Related [+] filed by Charles Anderson. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 113 ,112
Thursday, May 08, 2025
114 114 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/08 3:25 PM
Affidavit of Service of Ishrat Khan Regarding Certificate of No Objection for the Plan Administrators Fourth Omnibus Objection to Certain (I) Amended Claims; (II) Modified Amount and Priority Claims; (III) No Liability Claims; (IV) Dmp Claims; and (V) Claims to Be Reclassified, and Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 16, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Related [+] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David)
Related: [-] 77 ,76