Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:22-mj-00933
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 17, 2022 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Oscar Damian-Salazar (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Elizabeth Ann O'Connell
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Corpus Christi MagDuty
contact info
Barbara De Pena
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/17/2022 2:42 AM CDT
Saturday, August 13, 2022
Arrest of Oscar Damian-Salazar. (AnnSalazar, 2)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 14, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Oscar Damian-Salazar (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 8/15/2022 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton (amireles, 2)
Related: [-]