Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robert N Scola, Jr
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:22-cv-22619
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2022
Last checked: Monday Feb 13, 2023 7:30 AM EST
Defendant
Alltheway Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
Danielle Tamara Gauer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Brian Del Gatto
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Taylor H. Allin
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOSE LUIS DE MEDEIROS
Represented By
Danielle Tamara Gauer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Brian Del Gatto
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Taylor H. Allin
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Represented By
Danielle Tamara Gauer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Brian Del Gatto
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Taylor H. Allin
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
CHENXI LI
Represented By
Danielle Tamara Gauer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Brian Del Gatto
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Taylor H. Allin
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
PTL GP, LLC
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Plaintiff
AYMREE DELGADO
Represented By
Edward Steven Schwartz
Gerson & Schwartz PA
contact info
Philip Maurice Gerson
Gerson & Schwartz
contact info
Brian M Andino
State Attorney'S Office, Seventeenth Judicial Circuit O
contact info
Plaintiff
CAMILO DELGADO
Represented By
Edward Steven Schwartz
Gerson & Schwartz PA
contact info
Philip Maurice Gerson
Gerson & Schwartz
contact info
Brian M Andino
State Attorney'S Office, Seventeenth Judicial Circuit O
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander Delgado
Represented By
Edward Steven Schwartz
Gerson & Schwartz PA
contact info
Philip Maurice Gerson
Gerson & Schwartz
contact info
Brian M Andino
State Attorney'S Office, Seventeenth Judicial Circuit O
contact info

GPO Dec 05 2022
ORDER denying 35 Motion to Quash Service of Process. Responses due by 12/20/2022 Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 10, 2023
56 56 motion Protective/Confidentiality Order Fri 02/10 3:32 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order by JOSE LUIS DE MEDEIROS, CHENXI LI. (Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective/Confidentiality Order Fri 02/10 4:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking56 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order. The Court's Discovery Procedures Order states that " [n]o written discovery motions , including motions to compel, for protective order, or related motions for sanctions shall be filed unless specifically authorized by the Court." [ECF No.6 , p. 2 (emphasis in original; footnote omitted)]. Either party may contact the Undersigned's Chambers to set a discovery matter for hearing in accordance with the6 Discovery Procedures Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/10/2023. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
54 54 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Wed 02/08 12:39 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian Del Gatto. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16308829 by Alltheway Trucking, Inc., JOSE LUIS DE MEDEIROS, CHENXI LI, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation. Responses due by 2/22/2023(Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING,
Att: 2 CERTIFICATION OF BRIAN DEL GATTO, ESQUIRE
52 52 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Wed 02/08 10:34 AM
Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Taylor H. Allin. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16307939 by Alltheway Trucking, Inc., JOSE LUIS DE MEDEIROS, CHENXI LI, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation. Responses due by 2/22/2023(Gauer, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING,
Att: 2 CERTIFICATION OF TAYLOR H. ALLIN, ESQUIRE
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/08 11:31 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: granting counsel's motion to appear pro hac vice, consent to designation, and request to electronically receive notices of electronic filing.52 . Attorney Taylor H. Allin is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of Defendants Alltheway Trucking, Inc.; Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.; Jose Luis Medeiros; and Chenxi Li. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (cst)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/08 4:04 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: granting counsel's motion to appear pro hac vice, consent to designation, and request to electronically receive notices of electronic filing.54 . Attorney Brian Del Gatto is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of Defendants Alltheway Trucking, Inc.; Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.; Jose Luis Medeiros; and Chenxi Li. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (cst)
Related: [-]