Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:22-cv-03289
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2022
Terminated:Feb 24, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 12, 2023 9:47 AM EST
Defendant
Norman Boyd
Represented By
Daniel S. Walsh
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Cathelynn Tio
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Karesha Laing
Represented By
Daniel S. Walsh
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Cathelynn Tio
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Caylee Noggle
Represented By
Daniel S. Walsh
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Cathelynn Tio
Doj-Usao
contact info
Interested Party
Amayi Bloodsaw, M.D.
Interested Party
Kimberly Queen, N.P.
Interested Party
Georgia Alliance of Community Hospitals
610 Ridge Ave
Tifton, GA 31794
Represented By
Kathlynn Butler Polvino
Kbp Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Augusta Birth Center, Inc.
Represented By
Yasha Heidari
Heidari Power Law Group LLC
contact info
Anastasia P. Boden
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Joshua Polk
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
Katie Chubb
Represented By
Yasha Heidari
Heidari Power Law Group LLC
contact info
Anastasia P. Boden
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Joshua Polk
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info

GPO Feb 24 2023
OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiffs lack standing, the Court cannot reach the merits of their claims and thus declines to address the Defendants' arguments under Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 02/24/2023. (jkb) Modified on 2/24/2023 (jkb).
GPO Jul 11 2023
ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Amend the Complaint 28 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/11/2023. (tht)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 19, 2024
38 38 appeal USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal Fri 07/19 9:59 AM
USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal of Voluntary Dismissal: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellants Katie Chubb and Augusta Birth Center, Inc. is GRANTED re:32 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-12364 W. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
37 37 appeal USCA Order Mon 10/16 8:38 AM
USCA Order: Motion to withdraw attorney McClintock is GRANTED. Motion to substitute attorney Stump for attorney McClintock is GRANTED re:32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., and Katie Chubb. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-12364 B. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
appeal Appeal Record Certified Wed 08/30 12:11 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,32 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-12364 BB. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
36 36 appeal Transcript Order Form Tue 07/25 2:07 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (No Hrgs) re:32 Notice of Appeal. (Polk, Joshua) Modified on 7/25/2023 to update text (pjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
35 35 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Tue 07/25 9:16 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-12364 B. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
34 34 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 07/19 3:42 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Orders and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:32 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
Related: [-]
33 33 appeal USCA Appeal Transmission Wed 07/19 3:26 PM
USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA- 11th Circuit re:32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., and Katie Chubb. (pjm)
Related: [-]
32 32 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 07/19 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to31 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-12755779. Transcript Order Form due on 8/2/2023 (Polk, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
31 31 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 07/11 3:42 PM
ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Amend the Complaint28 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/11/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Wed 05/24 12:01 PM
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Andrew B McClintock replacing attorney Daniel S. Walsh. (McClintock, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 04/26 2:16 PM
Submission of28 MOTION for Reconsideration re26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/06 2:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Reconsideration re26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Norman Boyd, Karesha Laing, Caylee Noggle. (Walsh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
28 28 motion Reconsideration Fri 03/24 8:52 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, with Brief In Support by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb.(Polk, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, February 24, 2023
27 27 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 02/24 9:31 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (jkb)
Related: [-]
26 26 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 02/24 9:19 AM
OPINION AND ORDER granting17 Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiffs lack standing, the Court cannot reach the merits of their claims and thus declines to address the Defendants' arguments under Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 02/24/2023. (jkb) Modified on 2/24/2023 (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/24 9:21 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Tue 01/03 11:17 AM
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Cathelynn Tio replacing attorney Cathelynn Tio. (Tio, Cathelynn)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Tue 01/03 8:50 AM
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Anastasia P. Boden replacing attorney Anastasia P. Boden. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 10/20 10:18 AM
Submission of17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
23 23 respm Reply Brief Wed 10/19 1:28 PM
REPLY BRIEF re17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Norman Boyd, Karesha Laing, Caylee Noogle. (Tio, Cathelynn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/05 3:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb. (Boden, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
21 21 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 10/03 5:07 PM
RESPONSE in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Georgia Alliance of Community Hospitals. (Polvino, Kathlynn)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 09/30 3:19 PM
ORDER: The parties' obligations to comply with the deadlines to submit initial disclosures, conduct the Rule 26(f) early planning conference, and submit the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan are stayed pending the Court's decision on Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/30/2022. (jra)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 09/30 11:40 AM
ORDER (by docket entry) granting19 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. Ordered by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/30/2022. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Thu 09/29 5:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae with Brief In Support by Georgia Alliance of Community Hospitals.(Polvino, Kathlynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae
Thursday, September 22, 2022
18 18 motion Stay Thu 09/22 2:29 PM
MOTION to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines with Brief In Support by Norman Boyd, Karesha Laing, Caylee Noogle.(Tio, Cathelynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
17 17 motion Dismiss Wed 09/21 11:15 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Brief In Support by Norman Boyd, Karesha Laing, Caylee Noogle.(Tio, Cathelynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
16 16 service Return of Service Executed Tue 09/13 11:25 AM
Return of Service Executed by Katie Chubb, Augusta Birth Center, Inc.. Norman Boyd served on 8/31/2022, answer due 9/21/2022. (Polk, Joshua)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Return of Service Executed Tue 09/13 11:24 AM
Return of Service Executed by Katie Chubb, Augusta Birth Center, Inc.. Karesha Laing served on 8/31/2022, answer due 9/21/2022. (Polk, Joshua)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Return of Service Executed Tue 09/13 11:23 AM
Return of Service Executed by Katie Chubb, Augusta Birth Center, Inc.. Caylee Noogle served on 8/31/2022, answer due 9/21/2022. (Polk, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
13 13 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/06 4:29 PM
ORDER granting7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Polk. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/6/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/06 4:25 PM
ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anastasia P Boden. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/6/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Tue 09/06 12:46 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:7 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua Polk Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joshua Polk added appearing on behalf of Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb (cdg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 09/06 4:35 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joshua Polk re13 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jra)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 09/06 4:37 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anastasia P Boden re12 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jra)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 09/02 10:46 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Anastasia Boden Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Anastasia P. Boden added appearing on behalf of Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb (cdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 08/29 11:18 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Norman Boyd, Karesha Laing, and Caylee Noogle.(jra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Laing,
Att: 2 Summons Noggle
Saturday, August 27, 2022
10 10 service Proposed Summons Sat 08/27 1:35 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Katie Chubb Defendant Noggle (Heidari, Yasha)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proposed Summons Sat 08/27 1:34 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Katie Chubb Defendant Laing (Heidari, Yasha)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Proposed Summons Sat 08/27 1:33 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Katie Chubb for Defendant Boyd (Heidari, Yasha)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Sat 08/27 1:31 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua Polk Pro Hac Vice.by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb. (Heidari, Yasha)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Sat 08/27 1:30 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Anastasia Boden Pro Hac Vice.by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb. (Heidari, Yasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 08/26 3:14 PM
ORDER DECLINING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-03289-TWT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/26/2022. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Thu 08/25 4:54 PM
RETURN of3 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua Polk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12007383). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Thu 08/25 4:56 PM
RETURN of4 APPLICATION for Admission of Anastasia P Boden Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12007395). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
4 4 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/18 4:51 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Anastasia P Boden Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12007395).by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb. (Heidari, Yasha)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/18 4:49 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua Polk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12007383).by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb. (Heidari, Yasha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 08/17 11:57 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Augusta Birth Center, Inc., Katie Chubb. (gas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/17 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Katie Chubb, Augusta Birth Center, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12001521)(gas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet