New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:22-cv-07029
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2022
Last checked: Monday Feb 13, 2023 10:31 AM EST
Defendant
Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc.
15 N. Oxford Street
Brooklyn, NY 11205
Represented By
Joseph Gusmano
Littler Mendelson
contact info
William H Ng
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Lior Rachmany
15 N. Oxford Street
Brooklyn, NY 11205
Represented By
Joseph Gusmano
Littler Mendelson
contact info
William H Ng
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Milija Brkic
Represented By
Paul Andrew Bartels
Bell Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 09/10 5:18 PM
ORDER denying35 Motion for Reconsideration. This "motion for reconsideration" is untimely. The Court's order was entered in January 2023, and the 10 day period for reconsideration has long since passed. So has the time for taking an appeal - and an appeal was filed and the parties dismissed the appeal. This motion is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/10/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
37 37 17 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 08/23 2:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:35 MOTION for Reconsideration . . Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Grogan, Adam)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 08/23 2:08 PM
DECLARATION of Adam P. Grogan, Esq. in Support re:35 MOTION for Reconsideration .. Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Grogan, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Plaintiff
35 35 motion Reconsideration Fri 08/23 2:07 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration . Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Grogan, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/21 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Grogan on behalf of Milija Brkic..(Grogan, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
33 33 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 02/17 1:32 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Milija Brkic USCA Case Number 23-0125 The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 2/17/2023. (tp)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Fri 02/17 1:32 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:33 USCA Mandate. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
32 32 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 01/30 8:08 AM
FIRST NOTICE OF APPEAL from25 Memorandum & Opinion, Case Stayed,,,,. Document filed by Milija Brkic. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27264699. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 01/30 8:22 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:32 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File Mon 01/30 8:23 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Milija Brkic were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
31 31 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Fri 01/27 11:21 AM
DECISION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying28 Motion for Reconsideration re28 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration re;25 Memorandum & Opinion, Case Stayed,, . filed by Milija Brkic. The motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 28.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/27/2023) TO ALL PARTIES BY ECF (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
30 30 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 01/24 3:51 PM
DECLARATION of Paul A. Bartels in Support re:28 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration re;25 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Case Stayed,, .. Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Tue 01/24 10:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Paul Andrew Bartels to RE-FILE Document 27 Declaration in Support of Motion,. ERROR(S): Linked to a deficient entry. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
29 29 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 01/23 5:03 PM
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:28 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration re;25 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Case Stayed,, . . Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Reconsideration Mon 01/23 5:02 PM
FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration re;25 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Case Stayed,, . Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 01/23 4:54 PM
DECLARATION of Paul A. Bartels in Support re:26 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration re;25 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Case Stayed,, .. Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration
26 26 motion Reconsideration Mon 01/23 4:53 PM
FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration re;25 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Case Stayed,, . Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul Bartels,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration
Monday, January 09, 2023
25 25 12 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion ~Util - Case Stayed Mon 01/09 12:30 PM
DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION re:14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action . filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany. Defendants' motion to compel arbitration is GRANTED, and these proceedings are stayed under 9 U.S.C. § 3 until 30 days after an award is entered. The prevailing party is directed to move to confirm the award within thirty days of its entry. The court will not keep the case open forever. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 14. This shall constitute the written opinion of the Court. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/9/2023) BY ECF TO ALL PARTIES (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
24 24 order Memo Endorsement Tue 01/03 6:10 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:23 Proposed Case Management Plan filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany. ENDORSEMENT: This plan has become irrelevant as the court is granting the motion to compel arbitration but the opinion will not be provided until next week. The initial conference scheduled for January 5 is off calendar. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/3/2023) (kv)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 01/03 9:57 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Gusmano, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
22 22 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 12/05 2:36 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action . . Document filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Ng, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
21 21 17 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/16 9:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action . . Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Affirmation in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/16 9:15 PM
AFFIRMATION of Paul Bartels, Esq. in Opposition re:14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action .. Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Milija Brkic Declaration
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/26 11:28 AM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re18 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action . addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Paul A. Bartels dated October 24, 2022.,14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action . Responses due by 11/16/2022 Replies due by 12/5/2022. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/25/2022) (tro)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/24 5:12 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action . addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Paul A. Bartels dated October 24, 2022. Document filed by Milija Brkic. Return Date set for 11/9/2022 at 04:46 PM..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
17 17 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 10/20 4:56 PM
DECLARATION of William H. Ng in Support re:14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action .. Document filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Ng, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement
16 16 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 10/20 4:46 PM
DECLARATION of William H. Ng in Support re:14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action .. Document filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Ng, William)
Related: [-]
15 15 24 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 10/20 4:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action . . Document filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Ng, William)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Compel Arbitration Thu 10/20 4:43 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action . Document filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Ng, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
13 13 6 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 09/15 12:34 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 1/5/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. Parties should dial in at 1(888) 363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/15/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 09/15 12:27 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Extension granted. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/15/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time Thu 09/15 12:02 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from William H. Ng dated September 15, 2022. Document filed by Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Ng, William)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/15 12:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc. answer due 10/20/2022; Lior Rachmany answer due 10/20/2022. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/14 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Gusmano on behalf of Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Gusmano, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/14 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William H Ng on behalf of Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany..(Ng, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/31 9:32 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Lior Rachmany served on 8/30/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. Service was accepted by Parker Doe MANAGER. Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/31 9:30 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc. served on 8/30/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. Service was accepted by Parker Doe MANAGER. Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 08/18 1:23 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lior Rachmany..(pc)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 08/18 1:22 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 08/18 10:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 08/18 10:13 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/18 10:15 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 08/18 10:15 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Andrew Bartels. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank; County code Kings;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/17 8:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 08/17 7:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lior Rachmany, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 08/17 7:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/17 5:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Dumbo Moving & Storage, Inc., Lior Rachmany. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26562028)Document filed by Milija Brkic..(Bartels, Paul)
Related: [-]