South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Case #: 2:22-cv-02698
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2022
Terminated:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 11, 2023 7:34 AM EST
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By
Robert Canna Blain
Gaffney Lewis LLC
contact info
Emmanuel Ferguson, I
Gaffney Lewis LLC
contact info
Jarrett Walker Withrow
Gaffney Lewis LLC
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Canna Blain
Gaffney Lewis LLC
contact info
Emmanuel Ferguson, I
Gaffney Lewis LLC
contact info
Jarrett Walker Withrow
Gaffney Lewis LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robin Hawkins
Represented By
Michael Anthony Melonakos
The Melonakos Law Firm LLC
contact info
Ryan Patrick Alderson
The Melonakos Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
28 28 misc Judgment Wed 02/07 3:35 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. against Robin Hawkins. (gray)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 02/07 3:34 PM
ORDER AND OPINION granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/7/2024. (gray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/29 4:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Blain, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Robin Hawkins Deposition Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Photographs,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Donyell Carr Deposition Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Email from Defense Counsel
Friday, August 25, 2023
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/25 1:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Robin Hawkins.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/1/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Incident Report,
Att: 2 Deposition of Doneyll Carr
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Tue 08/15 12:58 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Response to Motion due by 8/29/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Blain, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support Defendants' Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Wed 08/02 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Ryan Patrick Alderson for 02/09/2024-02/23/2024 (Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Show Cause Thu 07/13 10:10 AM
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/13/2023. (gray)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
20 20 motion Show Cause Fri 06/16 10:14 AM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Response to Motion due by 6/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Withrow, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Correspondence to Dream Center Registered Agent,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
19 19 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Wed 04/19 8:11 AM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Robin Hawkins.(Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 04/11 11:37 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 17 Motion to Compel without opposition. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/11/2023. (gray)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
17 17 motion Compel Thu 03/16 10:38 AM
MOTION to Compel Non-Party Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Response to Motion due by 3/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Withrow, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 12-1-22 Subpoena to Dream Center Clinic,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 12-1-22 Dream Center Clinic Subpoena Response,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 1-27-23 Letter to Dream Center Clinic,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 2-9-23 Dream Center Clinic Refusal,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 2-10-23 and 2-14-23 Letters to Dream Center Clinic
Monday, November 21, 2022
16 16 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Mon 11/21 8:47 AM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Robin Hawkins.(Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/19 9:49 AM
JOINT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/14/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/19/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/23/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/23/2023, Discovery due by 7/19/2023, Motions due by 8/21/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 11/20/2023, Mediation Due by 8/21/2023. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 09/19/2022. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Confidentiality Order Mon 09/19 9:47 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 09/19/2022. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
13 13 motion Confidentiality Order Fri 09/16 4:50 PM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Withrow, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Confidentiality & Protective Order
12 12 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 09/16 4:49 PM
Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Withrow, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Fri 09/16 4:48 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Withrow, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Joint Amended Scheduling Order
10 10 discov Rule 26(f) Report Fri 09/16 4:47 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Withrow, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
9 9 order Mediation Order Thu 08/25 11:18 AM
MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 2/21/2023 Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/25/22. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/25 11:16 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/15/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/29/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 9/29/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/20/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/21/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/21/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/21/2022, Discovery due by 2/21/2023, Motions due by 3/23/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 6/21/2023, Mediation Due by 2/21/2023 Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/25/22. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
6 6 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 08/24 2:07 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robin Hawkins.(Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
3 3 respoth Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal Wed 08/17 4:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (adic, )
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 08/17 4:49 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(adic, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 08/17 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Charleston County, South Carolina, case number 2022-CP 10-03178 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10647671), filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(adic, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents