Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:James R Sweeney II
Referred: Tim A Baker
Case #: 1:22-cv-01636
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 15, 2023 4:58 AM EST
Counter Claimant
FAMILY FORD, LLC
Represented By
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Counter Claimant
CIL, INC.
Represented By
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Counter Defendant
CB HOLDINGS, LLC
Counter Defendant
I C DELIVERIES CORPORATION
Counter Defendant
CHUCK CALLAHAN FORD, INC.
Counter Defendant
GAINES LAND GROUP, LLC
Represented By
Matthew S. Tarkington
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info
Richard S. VanRheenen
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info
Tabitha Lucas Balzer
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
CALLAHAN REALTY CO., INC.
Counter Defendant
CIL, INC.
Represented By
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Counter Defendant
BURD AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Cross Claimant
FAMILY FORD, LLC
Represented By
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Cross Claimant
CIL, INC.
Represented By
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Cross Defendant
CIL, INC.
Represented By
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Cross Defendant
CHUCK CALLAHAN FORD, INC.
Cross Defendant
CALLAHAN REALTY CO., INC.
Cross Defendant
FAMILY FORD, LLC
Represented By
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Cross Defendant
GAINES LAND GROUP, LLC
Represented By
Matthew S. Tarkington
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info
Richard S. VanRheenen
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info
Tabitha Lucas Balzer
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
I C DELIVERIES CORPORATION
Cross Defendant
CB HOLDINGS, LLC
Cross Defendant
BURD AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Defendant
I C DELIVERIES CORPORATION
Defendant
FAMILY FORD, LLC
Represented By
Dakota Christopher Slaughter
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Defendant
CIL, INC.
Represented By
Dakota Christopher Slaughter
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Jackson Lee Schroeder
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
Seth M. Thomas
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Brad R. Sugarman
Bose Mckinney & Evans, Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Defendant
CHUCK CALLAHAN FORD, INC.
Defendant
CB HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
Allison Wells Gritton
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Tyler Jackson Mitchell
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Defendant
CALLAHAN REALTY CO., INC.
Defendant
BURD AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Represented By
Allison Wells Gritton
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Tyler Jackson Mitchell
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Interested Party
STOLL KEENON OGDEN PLLC
Represented By
Jenna M. Shives
Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
RONALD C. SMITH
Represented By
Jenna M. Shives
Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GAINES LAND GROUP, LLC
Represented By
Matthew S. Tarkington
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info
Richard S. VanRheenen
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info
Tabitha Lucas Balzer
Lewis & Kappes PC
contact info

GPO Apr 18 2024
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR BRIEF EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO COMPLETE FACT DISCOVERY AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO REOPEN LIMITED DISCOVERY: Gaines' motion for an extension of the deadline to complete fact discovery and, in the alternative, to reopen limited discovery is denied. [Filing No. 147.] This matter remains set for a settlement conference before the undersigned magistrate judge on May 9, 2024. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/18/2024. (LF)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.