South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referred: Molly H Cherry
Case #: 2:22-cv-02746
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2022
Terminated:Jan 10, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 15, 2023 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
GAL Leslie Armstrong
Defendant
Judge Anne Gue Jones
Plaintiff
Eugene Dingle
114 Porchester Ln
Greenville, SC 29605


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
14 14 misc Judgment Tue 01/10 2:04 PM
JUDGMENT: Dismissed this action without prejudice, without affording Plaintiff the opportunity to amend, and without issuance and service of process. (apsn)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation Tue 01/10 1:57 PM
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: After review, the Court finds no clear error and agrees with the Magistrate Judge's thorough analysis. Accordingly, the Court adopts in full the Magistrate Judge's Report (ECF No. 11) and specifically incorporates it herein, and the Court summarily dismisses this action without prejudice, without affording Plaintiff the opportunity to amend, and without issuance and service of process.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 01/10/2023. (apsn)
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Tue 01/10 2:06 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED13 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation,14 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Eugene Dingle 114 Porchester Ln Greenville, SC 29605. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
11 11 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 12/12 10:49 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by Eugene Dingle. It is recommended that the Court dismiss this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 12/12/2022. (apsn) Modified on 12/12/2022 to update docket text(apsn)
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Mon 12/12 10:51 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Eugene Dingle 114 Porchester Ln Greenville, SC 29605. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/15 3:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against GAL Leslie Armstrong, Judge Anne Love Jones, filed by Eugene Dingle. Service due by 2/13/2023.(apsn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 11/15 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Dingle, updated on docket. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
4 4 order Proper Form Order Thu 10/27 4:24 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 11/17/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 10/27/2022. (apsn)
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Thu 10/27 4:25 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED4 Proper Form Order, a Complaint for a Civil Case form, and the proper form document (a summons form) placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Eugene Dingle 281 Baccharis Dr Columbia, SC 29229 (apsn) Modified on 10/27/2022 to update docket text (apsn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/18 12:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Dorchester County Courthouse (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number SCX300100570.), filed by Eugene Dingle.(apsn)
Related: [-]