Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-16687
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Feb 19, 2023 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
JOSEPH WILLIAM HAYNES
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, August 18, 2022
5 5 Case transferred in from Gainesville Division Division on 08/18/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-201. (djb)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/18 3:24 PM
ORDER - The Clerk is hereby directed to assign all actions filed in, removed to, or transferred to this district which relate to, or seek damages from use of, the 3M Combat Arms Earplugs to the undersigned in the Pensacola Division. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 08/18 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum Western District of Texas by JOSEPH WILLIAM HAYNES (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/18 2:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/18 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7404610.), filed by JOSEPH WILLIAM HAYNES. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/18 3:31 PM
Case transferred in from Gainesville Division Division on 08/18/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-201. (djb)
Related: [-]