Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:22-mc-00066
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2022
Terminated:Sep 13, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
order Attorney Disciplinary Order Tue 09/13 12:27 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER Re: Attorney Disciplinary Action as to Jervan Steven Wiltz. The deadline for filing a response has passed. The clerk has imposed reciprocal discipline and attorney Jervan Steven Wiltz is suspended from practicing in the Northern District of Texas from 9/1/2022 - 2/29/2024. See Order1 for more details. If the attorney has an active ECF account, it will be terminated as of this date. Cases Report for Internal Users accessible[LINK:here] . (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/13/2022) (ali)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
1 1 order Attorney Disciplinary Order Thu 08/18 4:49 PM
Order Re: Attorney Disciplinary Action as to Jervan Steven Wiltz. Standing Order to show cause why this court should not impose reciprocal discipline. (Attorney Wiltz received an Agreed Judgment of Active Suspension from the State Bar of Texas. Active suspension period: 9/1/2022 - 2/29/2024). Cases Report for Internal Users accessible[LINK:here] . Attorney Response due in 14 days. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/18/2022) Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
Att: 1 Public Judgment Alert,
Att: 2 Agreed Judgment of Active Suspension