Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-01051
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2022
Last checked: Friday Aug 19, 2022 12:31 AM MST
Defendant
Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil (1)
Represented By
Milagros Anais Cisneros
Federal Public Defenders Office - Phoenix
contact info
Theron M Hall, III
Hall Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
LeighAnn Thomas
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/19/2022 1:18 AM MST
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
Arrest of Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil on 6/22/2022. (JMA) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil. (JMA) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(JMA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil held on 6/24/2022. NO FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Milagros Anais Cisneros for Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil with Appointment Type: FPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil held on 6/24/2022. Defendant ordered/continued detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil waived on 6/24/2022. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Interpreter required for Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil (1) Spanish. Case and defendant are transferred to the District Court in Phoenix for all further proceedings. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA John Ballos (Duty) for the Government, AFPD Jared Eggers for Milagros Cisneros for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Miguel Aguayo assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 1:49 PM to 1:59 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MM) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil. I conclude that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending trial in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. IT IS ORDERED that should an appeal of this detention order be filed with the District Court, it is counsel's responsibility to deliver a copy of the motion for review/reconsideration to Pretrial Services at least one day prior to the hearing set before the District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if a release to a third party is to be considered, it is counsel's responsibility to notify Pretrial Services sufficiently in advance of the hearing before the District Court to allow Pretrial Services an opportunity to interview and investigate the potential third party custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 6/24/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MM) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil. (Cisneros, Milagros) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to attorney Milagros A. Cisneros by Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil.(Cisneros, Milagros) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil. (MM) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
8 8 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 6/29/2022. (NM) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER granting7 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil (1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED withdrawing AFPD Milagros Cisneros and the Office of the Federal Public Defender as counsel of record in this matter effective immediately, and appointing CJA Attorney Theron Hall as counsel of record for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 6/29/2022.(KGM) [2:22-mj-02046-JFM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
11 11 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil (1) count(s) 1. Arraignment set for 8/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. (WLP)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
12 12 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil. (WLP)
Related: [-]
13 13 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Jesus Zazueta-Mendivil. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary