California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Alexander F Mackinnon
Case #: 2:22-cv-05885
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2022
Terminated:Dec 12, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 15, 2023 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
County of Los Angeles
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Sean Kusiak
Defendant
Caren Mandoyan
Plaintiff
Mark Tyrone Beasley
Represented By
Timaiah Smith
The Cochran Firm
contact info
Brian T Dunn
Cochran Firm California
contact info
Edward M Lyman, III
Cochran Firm California
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 12, 2022
13 13 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 12/12 2:07 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Pursuant to the Court's Order dismissing action12 , it is ordered, adjudged, and decreed that this case is dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Plaintiff shall take nothing from this action. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)
Related: [-]
12 12 5 pgs order Order Mon 12/12 2:04 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: On November 28, 2022, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why the action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution10 . In response, Plaintiff filed a declaration by his counsel. (Dunn Decl., ECF No.11 . Having considered the response, the Court dismisses the action for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Court directs the Clerk to enter judgment and close the case. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
11 11 misc Declaration Mon 12/05 9:09 PM
DECLARATION of Brian T. Dunn in Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Mark Tyrone Beasley. (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 11/28 10:30 AM
Order to Show Cause (LOP) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/5/2022. (smo)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
9 9 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 10/31 9:18 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court has revised its procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies in civil cases newly assigned to Judge Scarsi. The Court authorizes the parties to this case to follow the new procedures in lieu of the procedures stated in Initial Standing Order § 9(e). More information about the new procedures is available at https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-mark-c-scarsi THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 08/23 1:31 PM
Plaintiff's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Smith, Timaiah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 08/22 8:25 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Fri 08/19 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The Civil Cover sheet is blank. A corrected civil cover sheet should be e-filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 08/19 5:40 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 08/19 5:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 08/19 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 08/19 12:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Mark Tyrone Beasley. (Smith, Timaiah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/18 11:57 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33839357 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Brian T Dunn added to party Mark Tyrone Beasley(pty:bkmov))(Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]