Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria Ellena Chavez-Ruark
Case #: 0:22-bk-14553
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024

Debtor
Grayhound Trash Removal, Inc.
8301 Grey Eagle Dr
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772-2611
Represented By
Craig Palik
Mcnamee Hosea PA
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Cheryl E. Rose
9812 Falls Road, #114-334
Potomac, MD 20854


Docket last updated: 08/19/2022 12:03 PM EDT
Friday, August 19, 2022
crditcrd none Fri 08/19 10:33 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-14553 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A39899724. Fee amount 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Case Opening Fri 08/19 10:30 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Grayhound Trash Removal, Inc.. (Palik, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Fri 08/19 10:38 AM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Rose, Cheryl E. with 341(a)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Support Document Fri 08/19 10:51 AM
Support Document - Corporate Resolution Filed by Craig Palik Related [+]. (Palik, Craig)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Grayhound Trash Removal, Inc.