Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:22-cv-03335
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2022
Terminated:Dec 12, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2023 5:52 AM EST
Defendant
EASTERN AIRLINES LLC
550 E. SWEDESFORD RD.
WAYNE, PA 19087
Represented By
MERRY E. LINDBERG
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
SARAH PIERCE WIMBERLY
Ford & Harrison LLP
contact info
MARK A. SALOMAN
Ford Harrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KATIE "KHERPI" COX
42 E BROAD ST APT A
HATFIELD, PA 19440
Represented By
STEVEN AUERBACH
Law Office Of Steven T. Auerbach
contact info
Plaintiff
CATHYANA HARDEEN
42 E. Broad St Apt A
Hatfield, PA 18440
Represented By
STEVEN AUERBACH
Law Office Of Steven T. Auerbach
contact info
Plaintiff
SVETLANA SERBRIYSKAYA
42 E BROAD ST APT A
HATFIELD, PA 19440
Represented By
STEVEN AUERBACH
Law Office Of Steven T. Auerbach
contact info
Plaintiff
LAUREN MADISON MURDOCH
Represented By
STEVEN AUERBACH
Law Office Of Steven T. Auerbach
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 12, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Mon 12/12 4:17 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/12/22. 12/12/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/16 2:24 PM
NOTICE from Chambers of Judge McHugh. Re: To assist the Court with future scheduling of Case Management deadlines, counsel shall meet and confer on or before 12/16/22, and propose deadlines to the Court for a Case Management Order. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/11 4:13 PM
Defendant, Eastern Airlines, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by EASTERN AIRLINES LLC.(LINDBERG, MERRY)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/24 9:14 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER IS GRANTED AND THAT DEFENDANT, EASTERN AIRLINES LLC SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 11/11/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/24/22.10/24/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/21 5:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Attorney) filed by EASTERN AIRLINES LLC.Certificate of Service.(SALOMAN, MARK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/06 12:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CATHYANA HARDEEN, KATIE "KHERPI" COX, SVETLANA SERBRIYSKAYA, LAUREN MADISON MURDOCH. All Defendants. (AUERBACH, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 09/30 9:09 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S8 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SARAH PIERCE WIMBERLY, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/29/22.9/30/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 09/30 9:05 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S7 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MERRY E. LINDBERG, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/29/22.9/30/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 09/29 4:27 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sarah Pierce Wimberly, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16210414.) filed by EASTERN AIRLINES LLC.Certificate of Service.(SALOMAN, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 09/29 4:24 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Merry E. Lindberg, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16210358.) filed by EASTERN AIRLINES LLC.Certificate of Service.(SALOMAN, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Friday, September 23, 2022
6 6 misc State Court Record - Attachment Fri 09/23 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. SALOMAN on behalf of EASTERN AIRLINES LLC (SALOMAN, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit
Thursday, September 22, 2022
5 5 notice Certificate of Counsel Thu 09/22 4:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(2) Correspondence by STEVEN AUERBACH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AUERBACH, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 04, 2022
4 4 service Request for Waiver of Service Sun 09/04 2:00 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Eastern Airlines LLC on 8/26/22 by KATIE "KHERPI" COX, CATHYANA HARDEEN, LAUREN MADISON MURDOCH, SVETLANA SERBRIYSKAYA. Waiver of Service due by 9/26/2022. (AUERBACH, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
3 3 service Request for Waiver of Service Fri 08/26 1:07 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Eastern Airlines LLC on August 26, 2022 by KATIE "KHERPI" COX, CATHYANA HARDEEN, LAUREN MADISON MURDOCH, SVETLANA SERBRIYSKAYA. Waiver of Service due by 9/26/2022. (AUERBACH, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 08/23 7:46 AM
Summons Issued as to EASTERN AIRLINES LLC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/23/22. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 08/22 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16122816.), filed by CATHYANA HARDEEN, KATIE "KHERPI" COX, SVETLANA SERBRIYSKAYA, LAUREN MURDOCH "MADISON".(AUERBACH, STEVEN)
Related: [-]