South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referred: Mary Gordon Baker
Case #: 2:22-cv-02789
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2022
Terminated:May 16, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 16, 2024
45 45 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Thu 05/16 3:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 05/16/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
43 43 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/02 8:18 AM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/3/2024, Motions due by 7/3/2024. Motion GRANTED : 42 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by The Town of Summerville. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 5/2/2024. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
42 42 motion Amend/Correct Wed 05/01 4:03 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by The Town of Summerville. Response to Motion due by 5/15/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/17 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Leroy Barnes, Jr on behalf of Robert Barrineau (Barnes, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
40 40 misc Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Thu 02/29 12:03 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by The Town of Summerville.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
39 39 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Wed 01/31 4:50 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Timmie Myles.(Fulmer, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Nilsy Rapalo- Publications
38 38 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Wed 01/31 4:48 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Timmie Myles.(Fulmer, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Patrick G. Wiita - CV,
Att: 2 Supporting Documents Patrick G. Wiita - Fee Agreement
Friday, January 05, 2024
37 37 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 9:49 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 1/31/2024, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/29/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/3/2024, Discovery due by 5/2/2024, Motions due by 6/3/2024, Mediation Due by 5/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/5/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Order Fri 01/05 8:55 AM
TEXT ORDER. On August 10, 2023, the Court granted Defendant's Motion to Stay and stayed the proceedings in this case. (Dkt. Nos. 28; 29.) Upon agreement by the parties, the Court now LIFTS the stay and enters a Second Amended Scheduling Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/5/24. (akob, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 08/10 9:04 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will stay proceedings of the above-captioned case. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Motion GRANTED: 28 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 8/10/2023. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
28 28 2 pgs motion Stay Wed 08/09 2:23 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by The Town of Summerville. Response to Motion due by 8/23/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
25 25 misc Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Mon 07/17 3:24 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by The Town of Summerville.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
24 24 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Thu 06/15 4:33 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Timmie Myles.(Fulmer, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Busken, Daniel - Curriculum Vitae,
Att: 2 Exhibit Busken, Daniel - Retainer Agreement
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/25 3:54 PM
CONFERENCE AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/11/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 1/25/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/15/2023, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 6/15/2023, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/17/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/23/2023, Discovery due by 9/14/2023, Motions due by 11/13/2023, Mediation Due by 10/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/25/2023. (apsn)
Related: [-]
22 22 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 01/25 12:46 PM
Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by The Town of Summerville.(Haarsgaard, James)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Rule 26(f) Report Wed 01/25 12:45 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by The Town of Summerville.(Haarsgaard, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 12/29 11:58 AM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by Robert Barrineau.(Deters, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/21 8:14 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/11/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/25/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 1/25/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/15/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/17/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/17/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/17/2023, Discovery due by 6/16/2023, Motions due by 8/15/2023, Mediation Due by 7/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/21/2022. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
18 18 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/20 12:33 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by The Town of Summerville.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
17 17 21 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/16 11:40 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timmie Myles. Service due by 3/16/2023 (Fulmer, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 12/16 9:57 AM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Motion for Leave to File. On November 3, 2022, Defendants filed a Motion to Dismiss. (Dkt. No. 6.) On December 15, 2022, Plaintiff filed a consent Motion to file an Amended Complaint. (Dkt. No. 15.) The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to file an Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 15). Plaintiff must file the Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 15-1) by December 21, 2022. Additionally, because Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pertains to a pleading that is no longer controlling, the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 15) is MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/16/22.(akob, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Thu 12/15 3:09 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Timmie Myles. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Fulmer, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Amended Complaint
14 14 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 12/15 11:33 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Barrineau.(Deters, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
13 13 misc Letter Thu 12/08 12:10 PM
Letter from Drew Hamilton Butler. (Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/02 2:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Robert Barrineau.(Deters, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 11/17 2:38 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Summerville Police Department, Douglas Wright.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/17 9:03 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to the 6 Motion to Dismiss is due by December 8, 2022. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/17/22.(akob, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/16 11:21 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time by Timmie Myles. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Fulmer, H)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Acceptance of Service - Complaint Served Wed 11/16 11:16 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Timmie Myles. All Defendants.(Fulmer, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Wright, D,
Att: 2 Affidavit SPD
Thursday, November 03, 2022
6 6 motion Dismiss Thu 11/03 8:30 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Summerville Police Department, Douglas Wright. Response to Motion due by 11/17/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Butler, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/22 10:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Robert Barrineau, Summerville Police Department, Douglas Wright. Service due by 11/17/2022 (dgar)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 08/22 10:23 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Timmie Myles.(dgar)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/22 10:21 AM
COMPLAINT against Robert Barrineau, Summerville Police Department, Douglas Wright ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BSCDC-10657165.), filed by Timmie Myles. Service due by 11/17/2022(dgar)
Related: [-]