New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:22-cv-04967
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2022
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2023 4:40 AM EST
Defendant
Susana Duran
Represented By
Barbara E. Hoey
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Steven Ronald Nevolis
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wyckoff Heights Medical Center
Represented By
Barbara E. Hoey
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Steven Ronald Nevolis
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kerry-Ann Williams
Represented By
Olivia Marie Clancy
Shegerian & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
34 34 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Mon 04/14 7:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re33 Letter, Status Report Order Affidavit of Hardship by Kerry-Ann Williams (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
order Status Report Order Thu 04/03 5:16 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re33 : Plaintiff's response due by 4/11/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/3/2025. (KCA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
33 33 misc Letter Wed 04/02 6:01 PM
Letter from Barbara E. Hoey in Response to the Court's March 12, 2025 Order by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Barbara E. Hoey,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Description of Attorneys' Background and Work Experience,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Billing Records
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
32 32 20 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 03/12 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part26 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' motion for attorneys' fees is granted, and defendants' motion for additional sanctions is denied. Absent further information from defendants' counsel, the Court is unable to determine a specific amount of attorneys' fees at this time. Defendants may submit supplemental documentation regarding their request for an amount of attorneys' fees and costs in accordance with this Order within 21 days. Plaintiff may respond one week thereafter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/12/2025. (KCA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
31 31 misc Letter Tue 02/04 3:16 PM
Letter from Barbara E. Hoey Regarding the Court's Electronic Order dated 2/4/2025 by Wyckoff Heights Medical Center, Susana Duran (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/04 9:42 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry30 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/4/2025. (MI)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Tue 02/04 4:05 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application31 is GRANTED. Their motion26 for attorney's fees has been re-instated as of today's date and is still pending before MJ Pollak. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/4/2025. (MI)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/03 9:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kerry-Ann Williams dated February 3, 2025 (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
29 29 order Status Report Order Tue 01/28 1:17 PM
ORDER re26 : For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the Court has been holding the motion for attorneys' fees and/or sanctions26 in abeyance pending action from plaintiff indicating how she intends to proceed in this case. However, plaintiff has taken no further action in this case since she filed her opposition on April 19, 2024. If plaintiff intends to withdraw her Complaint, she should do so by February 4, 2025 , or else provide the Court with a proposed schedule for proceeding with the litigation, also by February 4, 2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/28/2025. (KCA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
28 28 respoth Reply in Support Fri 04/26 11:59 AM
REPLY in Support re26 MOTION for Attorney Fees and/or Monetary Sanctions filed by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
27 27 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Fri 04/19 8:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re26 MOTION for Attorney Fees and/or Monetary Sanctions dated April 19, 2024 filed by Kerry-Ann Williams. (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kerry-Ann Williams,
Att: 2 Declaration of Olivia M. Clancy, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B
Friday, April 05, 2024
26 26 motion Attorney Fees Fri 04/05 12:13 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and/or Monetary Sanctions by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Declaration of Joseph Foti,
Att: 3 Declaration of Barbara E. Hoey,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Initial Responses,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letters,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - PLF430,
Att: 7 Exhibit D - JHMC Timecard Records
Thursday, March 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 03/21 9:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re24 : No pre-motion conference is required. Defendants are to file their motion by 4/5/2024 . Opposition due 4/19/2024 . Reply, if any, due 4/26/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/21/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/18 8:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Kerry-Ann Williams. (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
24 24 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 12/15 2:54 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
minutes Status Conference Mon 11/20 12:52 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 11/17/2023. Appearance for Plaintiff: Olivia Marie Clancy. Appearance for Defendants: Barbara E. Hoey. By 12/15/2023, defendant to file pre-motion letter request - response 12/18/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 11/08 9:48 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting23 : Status Conference previously scheduled for 11/15/2023 is now set for 11/17/2023 @ 4:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Dial-in information remains the same. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/8/2023. (CH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
23 23 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 11/07 10:19 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference requested by Plaintiff by Kerry-Ann Williams. (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order Tue 11/07 9:42 AM
MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Status Conference previously scheduled for 11/9/2023 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak has been rescheduled to 11/15/2023 @ 2:15 PM . Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4967 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/7/2023. (DC) Modified on 11/7/2023 (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
22 22 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 10/24 3:27 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 10/24 3:38 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Status Conference is adjourned to 11/9/2023 @ 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4967 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/24/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 10/23 10:21 AM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER re21 : Status Conference set for 11/3/2023 @ 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 9:45 AM . Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4967 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/23/2023. (CH)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
21 21 misc Status Report Fri 10/13 5:55 PM
STATUS REPORT [Joint] by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
order Status Report Order Tue 08/29 9:24 AM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER re20 : Status Report due by 10/13/2023 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/29/2023. (CH)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
20 20 misc Status Report Mon 08/28 1:48 PM
STATUS REPORT [Joint] by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/11 1:52 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Pramschufer, Erik)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/11 2:21 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting Eric P. Pramschufer motion19 to withdraw as counsel for the defendants. Attorney Erik P. Pramschufer terminated. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/11/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/11 2:21 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erik P. Pramschufer terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/11/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 07/26 3:34 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference re18 proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 7/25/2023. Appearance for plaintiff: Olivia Clancy. Appearance for defendant: Barbara Hoey \ Erik Pramschufer. Plaintiff is Ordered to provide income tax returns, photographs (pursuant to a protective order) that are in plaintiffs possession in 30 days. Parties to meet and confer on medical records. Status report by 8/28/2023. . (FTR: 9:00 - 9:30) (DC)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 07/24 3:46 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to an unforeseen change in the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 10:15 AM is rescheduled to 7/25/2023 @ 9:00 AM (note same date, but different time) before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please see the earlier scheduling order for dial-in instructions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/24/2023. (BL)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 07/21 5:06 PM
STATUS REPORT by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center (Pramschufer, Erik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/21 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erik P. Pramschufer on behalf of Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center (aty to be noticed) (Pramschufer, Erik)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/03 4:36 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 3/31/2023. Appearance for plaintiff: Olivia Clancy. Appearance for defendant: Barbara Hoey. Parties to exchange outstanding documents in the next two weeks. Depositions to proceed. Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 @ 10:15 AM. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:15 AM . Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4967 (DC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
16 16 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/16 1:50 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Nevolis, Steven)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/16 2:29 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting Steven Ronald Nevolis's motion16 to withdraw as counsel for the defendants. Attorney Steven Ronald Nevolis terminated. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/16/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order Fri 03/03 10:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference previously scheduled for 3/7/2023 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak has been rescheduled to 3/31/2023 @ 11:15 AM. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4967 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/3/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Scheduling Order Wed 03/01 11:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to an unforeseen change in the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for 3/7/2023 at 2:15 PM is adjourned to 4:15 PM (note same date, but different time) before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 4:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4967 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/1/2023. (BL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 12/16 11:42 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 12/15/2022. Appearance for plaintiff: Olivia Clancy. Appearance for defendants: Barbara Hoey. Parties are to exchange document requests and interrogatories within 30 days. Responses due 30 days thereafter. Status Conference set for 3/7/2023 @ 2:15 PM. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM . Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4967 (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/07 5:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/07 5:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 10/25 4:21 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/25 4:41 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 12/7/2022. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/25/2022. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/11 6:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 12/15/2022 @ 2:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4967 So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/11/2022. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/20 2:50 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/20 2:25 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center. (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/20 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Ronald Nevolis on behalf of Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center (aty to be noticed) (Nevolis, Steven)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/20 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara E. Hoey on behalf of Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center (aty to be noticed) (Hoey, Barbara)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/20 2:30 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendants letter application10 for an extension of time to serve and file an answer is DENIED without prejudice to re-file their application addressed to MJ Pollak who will be handling all pre-trial matters in this litigation. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/20/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/20 3:17 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 11/7/2022. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/20/2022. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/13 2:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 08/23 4:02 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 08/23 4:01 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/23 4:01 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Duran summons
3 3 trial Exhibit Tue 08/23 3:11 PM
EXHIBIT A by Kerry-Ann Williams. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Kerry-Ann Williams. (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/23 2:51 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Kerry-Ann Williams (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/23 10:03 AM
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) *** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/23 3:58 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/22 8:54 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Susana Duran, Wyckoff Heights Medical Center filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15868124 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Kerry-Ann Williams. (Clancy, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons