Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:22-cv-02058
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000re Job Discrimination (Religion)
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2023 6:59 AM CST
Defendant
Mayo Clinic Hospital, Arizona
Represented By
George R Wood
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Hannah Camilleri Hughes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Katherine Tank
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Emily A McNee
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Lehoan T. Pham
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Holly M Robbins
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Kathryn Mrkonich Wilson
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Beverly Clubb
Represented By
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Wesley Clubb
Represented By
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Alice Couto
Represented By
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Mechalle Lifgren
Represented By
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 09/09 6:29 PM
ANSWER to24 Amended Complaint filed by Mayo Clinic, Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (Robbins, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
25 25 service Summons Issued Tue 08/27 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic, Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (ACH)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/26 5:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Mechalle Lifgren, Alice Couto, Wesley Clubb, Beverly Clubb. Filer requests summons issued. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
23 23 12 pgs order Order to Consolidate Cases Mon 07/08 12:10 PM
ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/3/2024.(kt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/01 7:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants. filed by Mechalle Lifgren, Alice Couto, Wesley Clubb, Beverly Clubb. Filer requests summons issued. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
21 21 minutes Status Conference Fri 06/14 2:34 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/14/2024: Status Conference. Digital Recording Telephone Conference Time: 9:01-9:22 a.m. Total Time: 21 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Gregory Erickson For Defendant(s): Emily McNee; Holly Robbins PROCEEDINGS: The Court held a status conference. The deadline for Defendants to answer in the 32 cases is extended until August 14, 2024. The parties must submit an amended Rule 26(f) report on or before June 28, 2024. The report should address matters such as a partial consolidation (or similar means for streamlining filing), regular status conferences, and proposals for scheduling of summary judgment and trial ready dates. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney Tue 04/02 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Bennett, Avery)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/29 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Lanari on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lanari, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Mon 10/30 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Mayo Clinic Hospital, Arizona. (Bennett, Avery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
17 17 minutes Status Conference Tue 09/12 5:02 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/12/2023: Status Conference. The parties jointly requested a stay of the above-captioned cases pending the Eighth Circuits decision in the Representative Cases (Case Nos. 22-cv-1327 JRT/ECW, 22-cv-1319 JRT/ECW, 22-cv-1405 JRT/ECW, 22-cv-1420 JRT/ECW, and 22-cv-1427 JRT/ECW). Based on the parties representations, and for purposes of judicial and party economy, the Court granted the stay on the record at the hearing. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT the above-captioned cases are STAYED pending the Eighth Circuits decision in the Representative Cases. Further, IT IS ORDERED that within 5 days after that decision, the parties must send an email requesting a status conference with the Court to Cowan_Wright_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov, and that within 21 days after the Eighth Circuits decision, the parties must file a proposed schedule and discovery plan in view of that decision. (TMA)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 09/12 12:49 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 9/12/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/12/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/30 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Tank on behalf of All Defendants. (Tank, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/08 12:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: See ORDER for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/8/2022.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
13 13 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Wed 11/30 5:27 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Proposed Limited Stay Plan and Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Pham, Lehoan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
12 12 minutes Status Conference Thu 11/10 1:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Status Conference held on 11/10/2022. 1.On or before November 30, 2022, the parties shall meet and confer and file a revised stipulated proposed Limited Stay Plan and Pretrial Scheduling Order, consistent with the Courts instruction for a streamlined, as opposed to staggered, schedule and for a deadline to amend the pleadings as a matter of right that is not triggered off the decision on the motions to dismiss in the representative cases.2.The parties shall notify the Court, by letter to Magistrate_Wright_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov, of the date of the hearing on the pending motions to dismiss in the representative cases within seven days after it has been scheduled. The Court will then set a status conference regarding the related cases. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Thu 11/03 8:32 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/3/2022.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
10 10 misc Letter to District Judge Tue 10/18 4:01 PM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Mayo Clinic Hospital, Arizona Joint . (McNee, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
notice Notice to Attorney - Retiring MJ Case Reassigned Mon 10/17 12:04 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-2058 JRT/ECW . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: the current hearings and conferences before the magistrate judge in this case will be cancelled unless otherwise indicated by the new MJ courtroom deputy. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 10/12 7:40 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Mayo Clinic Hospital, Arizona. Jointly Signed by Alice Couto, Beverly Clubb, Wesley Clubb, and Mechalle Lifgren.(McNee, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
7 7 misc Letter to District Judge Thu 09/29 3:54 PM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Mayo Clinic Hospital, Arizona (Joint) . (McNee, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
6 6 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 09/12 11:48 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Mayo Clinic Hospital, Arizona. (McNee, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 08/24 11:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mechalle Lifgren, Alice Couto, Wesley Clubb, Beverly Clubb. Mayo Clinic Hospital Arizona waiver sent on 8/23/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/24 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by George R Wood on behalf of All Defendants. (Wood, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/23 8:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic Hospital Arizona. (MMP)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 08/23 8:35 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Related [+] list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 22-cv-2058 (JRT/BRT). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
Related: [-] lated Cases-Non-MDL
Monday, August 22, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/22 5:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Mayo Clinic Hospital Arizona (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9714133) filed by Mechalle Lifgren, Alice Couto, Wesley Clubb, Beverly Clubb. Filer requests summons issued. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet