Washington Western District Court
Judge:Thomas S Zilly
Case #: 2:22-cv-01174
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2022
Terminated:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 19, 2023 2:34 AM PST
Defendant
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By
Jonathan P Heyl
Fox Rothschild Llp (charlotte)
contact info
Gavin William Skok
Fox Rothschild Llp (seattle)
contact info
Bryan J. Case
Fox Rothschild Llp (seattle)
contact info
Yara AlHowar
Fox Rothschild Llp (seattle)
contact info
Plaintiff
Benny Cheung
Represented By
Neal Ernest Bonrud, Jr.
Law Offices Of Neal Bonrud PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Guangying Cheung
Represented By
Neal Ernest Bonrud, Jr.
Law Offices Of Neal Bonrud PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 08, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/08 4:00 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs.In the event settlement is not perfected, either party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 02/07 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
36 36 motion Continue Thu 01/25 4:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Related Pretrial Deadlines , filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Noting Date 1/25/2024, (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
35 35 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Order on Cross Motion Thu 12/28 3:34 PM
ORDER. Allstate's18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Plaintiffs'28 cross-motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as follows: (a) The Court concludes, as a matter of law, that (i) Allstate failed to timely and appropriately deny coverage for Plaintiffs' personal property losses, and thus, it may not do so in this litigation; (ii) Plaintiffs' stand-alone appliances and personal effects are personal property; and (iii) the theft of Plaintiffs' stand-alone appliances and personal effects is a covered loss under the Policy. (b) The Court concludes, as a matter of law, that Allstate may not rely on the vandalism exclusion in the Policy to deny coverage as to Plaintiffs' losses resulting from theft of "fixtures, utilities, appurtenances, systems, and furnishings." (c) Plaintiffs cross-motion for partial summary judgment is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
34 34 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Tue 12/19 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Gavin William Skok for Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Text Modification Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines Fri 12/01 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re27 Minute Order on Motion to Continue. Docket text modified to include the following information: Jury Trial is set for 9/30/2024 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/03 4:43 PM
REPLY, filed by All Plaintiffs, TO RESPONSE to28 CROSS MOTION re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
32 32 respm Declaration Mon 10/30 7:30 PM
DECLARATION of Danette K. Leonhardi filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re28 CROSS MOTION re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/30 7:29 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, to28 CROSS MOTION re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of Motion Re-Noted Thu 10/12 9:27 AM
NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED:28 CROSS MOTION re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 11/3/2023, (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
29 29 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Wed 10/04 1:46 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document (Exhibit F) re20 Declaration, by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
28 28 motion Cross Motion Wed 09/27 5:17 PM
CROSS MOTION re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 10/20/2023, (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 15, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/15 4:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Parties'25 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Disclosure of expert testimony due by 3/11/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2024, Discovery Motions due by 5/2/2024, Discovery completed by 6/10/2024, Dispositive motions due by 7/11/2024, Motions related to expert testimony due by 7/18/2024, Motions in Limine due by 8/29/2024, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2024, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 9/13/2024. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Thu 09/14 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Yara AlHowar for Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (AlHowar, Yara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
25 25 motion Continue Tue 09/05 11:48 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Related Pretrial Deadlines , filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Noting Date 9/5/2023, (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/25 5:55 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, TO RESPONSE to18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
23 23 respm Response to Motion Mon 08/21 4:02 PM
RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Declaration Mon 08/21 10:35 AM
DECLARATION of Neal E. Bonrud Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment(Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U
21 21 respm Declaration Mon 08/21 10:22 AM
DECLARATION of Benny Cheung filed by Plaintiff Benny Cheung re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
20 20 respm Declaration Thu 08/03 4:58 PM
DECLARATION of Stephanie Parrish filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment(Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
19 19 respm Declaration Thu 08/03 4:47 PM
DECLARATION of Bryan J. Case filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment(Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
18 18 motion Partial Summary Judgment Thu 08/03 4:45 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Noting Date 8/25/2023, (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 16, 2023
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 06/16 12:15 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/14 11:17 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND filed by Benny Cheung.(Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 06/14 9:49 AM
ORDER granting Parties'14 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 06/13 12:51 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Benny Cheung. Noting Date 6/13/2023, (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
13 13 order TSZ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM) Wed 11/23 8:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5-7 days*. Jury Trial is set for 4/8/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 12/21/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/18/2023, Motions due by 11/9/2023, Discovery completed by 12/18/2023, Dispositive motions due by 1/18/2024, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 1/25/2024, Motions in Limine due by 3/7/2024, Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2024, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/22/2024, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/22/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (JDC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/07 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Yara AlHowar on behalf of Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (AlHowar, Yara)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
11 11 misc Joint Status Report Mon 10/24 2:46 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5-7. (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
10 10 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/19 1:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/16 11:02 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
8 8 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/08 8:33 AM
ORDER re7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan P Heyl for Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
7 7 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/07 2:39 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan P. Heyl FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7693219 (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/01 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bryan J. Case on behalf of Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Case, Bryan)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 09/02 10:48 AM
Attorney Gavin William Skok added for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company; per6 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
5 5 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Thu 08/25 9:38 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report due by 10/24/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/11/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/24/2022, (FMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
4 4 misc Jury Demand Wed 08/24 4:06 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Benny Cheung (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 08/24 8:26 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MJV)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/24 8:21 AM
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/23 9:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiffs Benny Cheung, Guangying Cheung. (Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/23 9:01 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Neal Ernest Bonrud, Jr added to party Benny Cheung(pty:pla), filed by Benny Cheung.(Bonrud, Neal)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7674251