New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nina Gershon
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:22-cv-04985
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2022
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 19, 2023 5:26 AM EST
Defendant
ULC Business Holdings, LLC,
Represented By
Jason W. Callen
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Loly Garcia Tor
K & L Gates, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Penza
Represented By
Patrick T. Collins
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Jonathan I. Handler
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Kevin Patrick Mulry
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, June 10, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/10 12:17 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE The stipulation at 31 is so ordered. The action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. ( Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 6/10/2024 ) (RG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
31 31 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/04 3:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Gregory Penza (Collins, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 05/14 9:23 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE30 Motion to Adjourn Conference. On consent, the status conference scheduled today is adjourned to 6/17/24 at 12:15 p.m. The parties shall file a stipulation or notice of dismissal on or before 6/14/24. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/14/2024. (AGB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
30 30 1 pgs motion Adjourn Conference Mon 05/13 12:21 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Scheduled for May 15, 2024 by ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Tor, Loly)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 03/11 9:50 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE29 Motion to Adjourn Conference. On consent, the conference scheduled for 3/13/24 is adjourned to 5/15/24 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip Courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/11/2024. (AGB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
29 29 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 03/08 2:31 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference filed jointly on behalf of both parties by Gregory Penza. (Collins, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
28 28 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/27 10:46 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 11/27/2023. Discovery is ongoing and all fact discovery will be completed by March 1, 2024. The March 13, 2024 pretrial conference at 11:00am is converted to a status conference. The parties will be prepared to address expert discovery/summary judgment/pretrial order at the next conference. Next Status Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/27/2023. (KG)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
order Scheduling Order Mon 09/18 10:28 AM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: Given that the Court is unavailable on the dates suggested by the parties in DE27 , a status conference is scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/18/2023. (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
27 27 misc Letter Fri 09/15 12:12 PM
Letter to Hon. Stephen I. Locke providing Status Report by Gregory Penza (Collins, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
26 26 minutes Status Conference Tue 08/01 11:37 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 8/1/2023. Defendant has produced its document responses and privilege log. Discovery in the UK will be necessary, and its timing is uncertain at this point. As a result, the parties will continue to work on all discovery and start scheduling depositions. Further, the parties will submit a joint status letter on September 15, 2023 to update the court on their progress, and provide three mutually agreeable dates for another status conference at which all sides will be prepared to discuss an amended scheduling order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/1/2023. (KG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
25 25 misc Letter Wed 06/28 6:42 AM
Letter Request to hold status conference by phone by ULC Business Holdings, LLC, (Callen, Jason)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Wed 06/28 3:44 PM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: Based on the representations set forth in DE25 , the in-person status conference set for 6/28/2023 is adjourned to 8/1/2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip Courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/28/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
24 24 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 06/20 9:08 AM
ORDER granting DE23 Motion for Protective Order. On consent, the parties' amended protective order is so ordered. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/20/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
23 23 motion Protective Order Mon 06/19 10:43 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order , requesting entry of Amended Stipulation and Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information by ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Tor, Loly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Red-Lined Version of Amended Order)
Friday, April 28, 2023
22 22 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/28 11:11 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 4/28/2023. Document discovery is ongoing. Defendant explained the unusual length of time required as related to the maintenance of the large number of documents abroad which are subject to various local privacy restrictions. Next status conference: June 29, 2023 at 2:30pm. The parties will be prepared to address discovery motions (if any) at that conference as well as an amended scheduling order. Next Status Conference set for 6/29/2023 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/28/2023. (KG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/04 10:05 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. On consent, the deadline to complete the production of documents is extended to and including May 15, 2023. The status conference set for April 28, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip Courthouse remains. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/4/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/03 3:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as to Document Production by ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Tor, Loly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
20 20 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 01/10 9:43 AM
ORDER granting DE19 Motion for Protective Order. The parties' stipulated protective order is so ordered. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 1/10/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
19 19 motion Protective Order Mon 01/09 9:29 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order - Stipulation and Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information - by ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Tor, Loly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 09, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/09 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan I. Handler on behalf of Gregory Penza (aty to be noticed) (Handler, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/06 11:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set; see attached order. Next In Person Status Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/6/2022. (KG)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/06 11:10 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke: Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/6/2022. DE13 and14 have been granted. The Court has adopted and so ordered the joint proposed scheduling order15 submitted by the parties. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee .The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/6/2022. (KG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
15 15 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 11/30 5:20 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order - Scheduling Order Worksheet by Gregory Penza (Collins, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/28 4:23 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Tor, Loly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/23 10:43 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16166819. by Gregory Penza. (Mulry, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Handler,
Att: 2 Certificate of Admission & Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Pro Hac Order
Monday, November 21, 2022
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/21 4:27 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16160234. by ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Callen, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, November 14, 2022
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/14 12:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Gregory Penza filed against ULC Business Holdings, LLC,, filed by Gregory Penza. (Collins, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/27 5:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ULC Business Holdings, LLC, identifying Corporate Parent SPX Technologies, Inc. for ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Tor, Loly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/26 11:41 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: A Tele-Initial Conference is set for 12/6/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 10/26/2022. (KG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Patrick Mulry on behalf of Gregory Penza (aty to be noticed) (Mulry, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/24 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Loly Garcia Tor on behalf of ULC Business Holdings, LLC, (notification declined or already on case) (Tor, Loly)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/24 12:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Tor, Loly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/27 11:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory Penza. ULC Business Holdings, LLC, waiver sent on 8/24/2022, answer due 10/23/2022. (Collins, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/23 3:41 PM
Summons Issued as to ULC Business Holdings, LLC,. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 08/23 3:39 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 08/23 3:35 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/23 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT against ULC Business Holdings, LLC, filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15870850 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Gregory Penza. (Collins, Patrick) Modified on 8/23/2022 (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/23 3:38 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]