Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:22-cv-01931
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2022
Terminated:Mar 29, 2024
Case in other court:Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, 21-CA-002863
Last checked: Sunday Feb 19, 2023 6:07 AM EST
Defendant
Morgan Exteriors, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Alan Hearing
Grayrobinson, PA
contact info
Charles J. Thomas
Grayrobinson, PA
contact info
Defendant
Kirk Morgan
Mediator
Christopher Shulman
Represented By
Christopher M. Shulman
Shulman Adr Law PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Bruce Lee
Represented By
Gregory R. Schmitz
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Ryan Dominick Naso
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 29, 2024
40 40 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/29 9:39 AM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and upon review of 39 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/29/2024, to expedite the resolution of this case. This case remains assigned to Judge Mary S. Scriven. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
39 39 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/21 12:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice (JOINT) by Bruce Lee. (Schmitz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
38 38 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/29 12:17 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 37 the Parties' Joint Motion to Permit Remote Mediation. The Parties are permitted to conduct mediation with Shane Munoz via teleconference. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/29/2024. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
37 37 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/25 3:33 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Permit Remote Mediation by Morgan Exteriors, Inc. (Moody, Eric) Modified text on 1/25/2024 (LNR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
36 36 order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 01/24 11:04 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 35 the Parties' Stipulated Motion to Substitute Mediator. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Mediator Christopher Shulman and SUBSTITUTE him with Shane Munoz as the Mediator in this action. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/24/2024. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
35 35 motion Substitute Party Fri 01/19 1:23 PM
Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Mediator by All Defendants. (Morrow, Key)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
34 34 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/03 7:50 AM
Case Reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:22-cv-01931-MSS-NHA. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (SAO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
33 33 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 12/28 4:59 PM
THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 8/19/2024. Bench/Non-Jury Trial set for OCTOBER 2024 Trial Term, which commences on 9/30/2024, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/1/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/28/2023. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/28 4:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 31 the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. A third amended case management and scheduling order will be entered under separate notice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/28/2023. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/08 1:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extend Deadlines by Bruce Lee.(Schmitz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Case Management Report
Monday, July 31, 2023
30 30 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/31 4:11 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:22-cv-1931-MSS-UAM. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
29 29 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 06/20 3:49 PM
SECONDED AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 6/18/2024. Bench/Non-Jury Trial set for August 2024 Trial Term, which commences on 8/5/2024, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/1/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. See Case Management and Scheduling Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/20/2023. (CM)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 06/20 3:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. The Court finds good cause to grant the requested extensions. The Court will enter a Second Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order adopting the parties' requested deadlines, subject to the Court's calendar. All other provisions of the Court's prior scheduling orders remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/20/2023. (CM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 06/15 12:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Documents Related to Uniform Case Management Report by Kirk Morgan, Morgan Exteriors, Inc..(Morrow, Key)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
26 26 notice Notice of appearance Thu 06/15 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Brian Moody on behalf of Kirk Morgan, Morgan Exteriors, Inc. (Moody, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 06/13 10:27 AM
TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 24 Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel, construed as a motion for Attorneys Charles J. Thomas and Gregory A. Hearing to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants. Attorneys Charles J. Thomas and Gregory A. Hearing have no further responsibility in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Attorneys Charles J. Thomas and Gregory A. Hearing as counsel of record in this case and to remove them from the electronic service list in CM/ECF. Defendants continued to be represented by Attorney Key Morrow. To the extent Attorney Eric Moody intends to represent Defendants in this matter, Attorney Moody must file a Notice of Appearance. The motion is denied without prejudice to the extent it seeks any greater or different relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/13/2023. (CM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
24 24 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 06/12 4:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kirk Morgan, Morgan Exteriors, Inc..(Thomas, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A
Monday, June 05, 2023
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 06/05 10:34 AM
TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice 22 Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Upon review, the Court finds that the motion suffers several deficiencies. First, the motion is not signed. ( See Doc. 22 at 3). Second, the signature block, although incomplete, appears to relate to the Defendants' new counsel, as opposed to the withdrawing counsel as required by M.D. Fla. R. 2.02(c)(2). See M.D. Fla. R. 2.02(c)(2) ("The withdrawing lawyer -- not the lawyer's present or former firm or another lawyer -- must move to withdraw unless unable because of an emergency, disability, or death."). Finally, despite the request to waive the requisite 14-days' notice to the client, ( see Doc. 22 at 2-3), such a request is unnecessary if counsel can represent that Defendants consent to the withdraw of the previous counsel. See M.D. Fla. R. 2.02(c)(1)(A)-(B). The movants may renew the motion, addressing the issues identified herein and in full compliance with this Court's local rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/5/2023. (CM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
22 22 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 06/02 3:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kirk Morgan, Morgan Exteriors, Inc..(Morrow, Key)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
21 21 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 04/26 9:21 AM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 12/18/2023 Bench/Non-Jury Trial set for FEBRUARY 2024 Trial Term, which commences on 2/5/2024, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/1/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/26/2023. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/25 6:11 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 19 the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Case Deadlines. An amended Case Management and Scheduling Order will be issued by separate notice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/25/2023. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/17 10:02 AM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Extend Case Deadlines and Memorandum of Law in Support by Bruce Lee. (Schmitz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
17 17 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/10 3:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Ryan D. Naso to Withdraw as Attorney by Bruce Lee. (Naso, Ryan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/10 3:51 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Unopposed Motion to Withdrawal [sic] as Counsel. Attorney Ryan D. Naso has no further responsibility in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Attorney Ryan D. Naso as counsel of record in this case and to remove him from the electronic service list in CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/10/2023. (CM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to amended complaint Thu 02/23 4:02 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 13 Amended Complaint by Kirk Morgan, Morgan Exteriors, Inc..(Hearing, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 02/13 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gregory R. Schmitz on behalf of Bruce Lee. Lead Counsel: Gregory R. Schmitz. (Schmitz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/09 11:56 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Morgan Exteriors, Inc., Kirk Morgan with Jury Demand. filed by Bruce Lee.(LD)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/09 11:08 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 11-1), shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to separately docket Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Dkt. 11-1). Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/9/2023. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/09 11:58 AM
NOTICE to counsel Gregory R. Schmitz of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/07 3:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to File Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bruce Lee.(Schmitz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
10 10 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 01/04 10:17 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 10/13/2023. Bench/Non-Jury Trial set for the DECEMBER 2023 Trial Term, which commences on 12/4/2023, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/1/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/4/2023. (KAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
9 9 misc Case Management Report Mon 10/10 1:40 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Thomas, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 10/04 6:11 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 7 the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report. The Parties shall have up to and including October 10, 2022 to file a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/4/2022. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 10/03 5:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Morgan Exteriors, Inc.. (Thomas, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/08 4:41 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Morgan Exteriors, Inc.. (Thomas, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/30 4:51 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint Amended Complaint by Morgan Exteriors, Inc..(Hearing, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 08/24 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gregory Alan Hearing on behalf of Morgan Exteriors, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Gregory A. Hearing. (Hearing, Gregory)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 08/24 10:59 AM
NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SET)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:22-cv-1931-MSS-MRM. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Tue 08/23 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 21-CA-002863 filed in State Court on August 9, 2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19916855 filed by Morgan Exteriors, Inc..(Thomas, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 5 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/23 4:13 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:22-cv-1931-MSS-MRM. (SJB)
Related: [-]