Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Ivan Lr Lemelle
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:22-cv-02833
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2022
Terminated:Nov 23, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Feb 19, 2023 4:33 AM CST
Defendant
Derryl Himel
Represented By
Karen T. Bordelon
Babineaux, Poche, Anthony & Slavich, LLC
contact info
Joel Paul Babineaux
Babineaux, Poche, Anthony & Slavich, LLC
contact info
Sarah B. Dupont
Babineaux, Poche, Anthony & Slavich, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation
Represented By
Andrew Russell Lee
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
P.J. Kee
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Reliant Recycling, L.L.C.
Represented By
Christopher K. Ralston
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Rebecca Sha
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Clerc Cooper
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
43 43 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/23 3:50 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all of the parties to this action have firmly agreed upon a compromise. IT IS ORDERED that the action be and is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated. The Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties for a reasonable period of time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL PENDING MOTIONS BETWEEN SETTLING PARTIES ARE DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/23/2022. (dw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
42 42 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 09/19 11:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. IT IS ORDERED that Civil Action No. 22-2833 (B)(4) is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 22-2822 (B)(4), which shall be the master case under Local Rule 10.2. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/14/2022.(pp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
41 41 order Protective Order Fri 09/16 1:59 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/15/2022.(caa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
40 40 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Thu 09/15 12:08 PM
ORDER that the Defendants' Motion to Expedite Discovery20 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants written discovery requests and depositions adhere to the scope of limitation needed to respond to the preliminary injunction hearing, and revisions to written discovery are made, as described herein. FURTHER ORDERED that responses to Defendants written discovery requests are completed within fourteen (14) days of issuance of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants provide fourteen (14) days notice to Plaintiff on depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/15/2022. (caa)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
39 39 motion Protective Order Fri 09/09 9:47 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order by Reliant Recycling, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(Ralston, Christopher) (caa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Att: 4 (9/9/2022) Attachment A
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
38 38 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 09/07 4:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2022 re20 MOTION for Expedited Discovery. Counsel argued the motion. The Court shall issue an order. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (jls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
37 37 respm Response/Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 09/06 5:08 PM
REPLY/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation re20 MOTION to Expedite Discovery.(ajn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 09/06 5:00 PM
ORDER Granting35 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/6/2022. (ajn)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
35 35 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/02 4:55 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery by Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Proposed Written Discovery,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
34 34 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 09/02 4:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING28 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Opposition Deadline . IT IS ORDERED that the current preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for Tuesday, September 6, 2022 shall be continued and re-set for Tuesday, November 1 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom C-501; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' deadline to oppose the underlining preliminary injunction7 motion scheduled for Friday, September 2, 2022 shall be continued. Defendants shall file responsive pleadings, if any, no later than Monday, October 24, 2022; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants'11 motion to continue, defendants'12 motion to expedite defendants' motion to continue, defendants'18 motion to reconsider, and defendants'19 motion to expedite motion to reconsider are DISMISSED as moot in light of this order. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/2/2022.(pp)
Related: [-]
33 33 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Fri 09/02 1:14 PM
ORDER that Defendants' Motion for Expedited Discovery20 shall be heard by oral argument on 9/7/2022, at 11:00 a.m. in the undersigned United States Magistrate Judges Courtroom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/2/2022.(caa)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Fri 09/02 1:11 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Expedite. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall take the Defendants Motion for Expedited Consideration under submission on 9/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/2/2022. (caa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
31 31 minutes Status Conference Fri 09/02 1:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Follow up Status Conference held on 9/1/2022. The Court instructed Defendants counsel to send Plaintiffs counsel the proposal of the joint motion to continue the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court ordered the parties to appear for oral arguments on Defendants motion for expedited discovery on 9/7/2022.(caa)
Related: [-]
30 30 minutes Status Conference Set Hearings Fri 09/02 10:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Follow up Status Conference held on 9/1/2022. The Court ordered that it shall take Defendants Motion for Expedited Consideration under submission on 9/6/2022, at 9:30 am. The Court scheduled a follow up status conference to address this matter on 9/1/2022, via Zoom at 4:30 pm.(caa)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Continue Thu 09/01 9:37 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Opposition Deadline by Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/01 4:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant shall file its responsive pleadings no later than Friday, October 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/1/2022. (pp)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 09/01 4:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant shall file its responsive pleadings no later than Monday, October 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/31/2022. (pp)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/01 12:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Derryl Himel served on 8/26/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Ralston, Christopher)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/01 12:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation served on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Ralston, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
29 29 minutes Status Conference Fri 09/02 9:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Status Conference held on 8/31/2022. The Court ordered the Defendants counsel to submit to the Plaintiffs and the Court, a proposed consent protective order and certification before the next scheduled status conference at 9:30 am on 9/1/2022, via Zoom. The Court will allow Plaintiffs to submit an opposition to Defendants motion for expedited discovery before making a ruling. Further, the Court will consider the issue of depositions and the clients availability for depositions.(caa)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/31 8:16 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Reliant Recycling, L.L.C. re20 MOTION to Expedite Discovery . (Ralston, Christopher)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/31 4:24 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Derryl Himel.(Babineaux, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 motion Expedite Wed 08/31 2:01 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite 20 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 motion Expedite Wed 08/31 12:25 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/14/2022.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
19 19 motion Expedite Wed 08/31 12:22 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite 18 Motion to Reconsider by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 motion Reconsideration Wed 08/31 12:00 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/28/2022.(Lee, Andrew) Modified text on 8/31/2022 (pp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
17 17 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 08/30 4:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Set Preliminary Injunction Hearing . IT IS ORDERED that the hearing date for plaintiff's underlining7 motion for preliminary injunction is set for Tuesday September 6, 2022 at 9 a.m. before the undersigned in courtroom C-501. Defendants' opposition, if any, should be filed no later than Friday September 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/30/2022.(pp)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/30 12:08 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Reliant Recycling, L.L.C. re11 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (R. Doc 7) and on Plaintiff's Motion to Set Evidentiary Hearing (R. Doc. 8) . (Ralston, Christopher)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Expedite Tue 08/30 11:57 AM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery and to Set Status Conference by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/14/2022.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
14 14 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/30 11:44 AM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation re8 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Set Preliminary Injunction Hearing . (Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 08/30 11:31 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Expedite Tue 08/30 11:00 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite 11 Motion to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiff's Motion [7, 8] by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Continue Tue 08/30 10:57 AM
MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (R. Doc 7) and on Plaintiff's Motion to Set Evidentiary Hearing (R. Doc. 8) by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/14/2022.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Monday, August 29, 2022
10 10 motion Continue Mon 08/29 10:33 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Set Evidentiary Hearing (R. Docs. 7, 8) by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Consolidate Cases Mon 08/29 8:54 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases (with no. 22-2822 by Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/14/2022.(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
8 8 motion Expedite Mon 08/29 7:40 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Set Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Reliant Recycling, L.L.C..(Ralston, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 08/29 4:32 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Reliant Recycling, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/14/2022.(Ralston, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Proposed Order,
Att: 20 Notice of Submission
6 6 1 pgs order Order Transferring Case Mon 08/29 3:58 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/29/2022.(am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 08/25 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation.(am)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Related Case(s) Wed 08/24 5:24 PM
Notice of Related Case(s) by All Defendants of related case(s) 22-cv-02822. Attorney Andrew Russell Lee added to party Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation(pty:dft).(Lee, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Wed 08/24 2:13 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance(Ralston, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 08/24 2:51 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/23 10:21 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Derryl Himel, Louisiana Scrap Metals Recycling Corporation (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9510890) filed by Reliant Recycling, L.L.C..Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Reliant Recycling, L.L.C.(pty:pla).(Ralston, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet